Epic Creations LLC v. The Filipino Community Center, Inc
Appellee: The Filipino Community Center, Inc
Trustee: U.S. Trustee, Office
Appellant: Epic Creations LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00601
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 EO: In light of the parties' stipulation continuing the briefing deadlines, ECF No. #5 , the hearing on Appellant's bankruptcy appeal is continued from February 18, 2020 to April 20, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FIRST STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR APPELLANT EPIC CREATIONS LLC DBA CREATIONS IN CATERING AND APPELLEE THE FILIPINO COMMUNITY CENTER, INC. TO FILE BRIEFS; ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/2019. (jo)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 EO: On November 18, 2019, a Certificate or Readiness was filed by the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Hawaii as to Appellant Epic Creations LLC dba Creations in Catering's appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's September 27, 2019 "Memorandum of Decision Regarding Contract Rejection Damages (Proofs of Claim Nos. 5 and 7)." ECF No. #3 . The court will hold a hearing on the Appeal on February 18, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Briefing shall be filed and served pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a) and Local Rule 8009.1. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 U.S. Bankruptcy Court's Certificate of Readiness. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #2 Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment, #3 Designation of the Record on Appeal and Statement of Issues, #4 Counter-Designation of the Record on Appeal, #5 Notice of Completion of Record on Appeal) (emt, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00601JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (apg, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS TO DISTRICT COURT: NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT: Bankruptcy Court Case Number: 18-00109- filed by Epic Creations LLC dba Creations in Catering's Notice of Appeal; Exhibit "A"; Memorandum of Decision Regarding Contract Rejection Damages (Proof of Claims Nos. 5. and 7.) entered September 27, 2019; Notice of Entry of Order or Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Appeal; Exhibit A) (apg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Creations LLC v. The Filipino Community Center, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Filipino Community Center, Inc
Represented By: Chuck C. Choi
Represented By: Allison A. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee, Office
Represented By: Curtis B. Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Epic Creations LLC
Represented By: Ted N. Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?