Kham v. Tham, et al.
Plaintiff: Sunnary Kham and Sam Kham
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Thanty Tham
3Rd Party Defendant: Doe Corporations, Partnerships and Other Entities 1-10 and Michael L. Prather
Case Number: 1:2019cv00606
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES AND ORDER by Thanty Tham - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/10/2019. (jo)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thanty Tham Re: 1) Tham's Responses to Plaintiff's First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents dated October 8, 2019 (Fieman, Jason)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00606 JMS -RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, state of Hawaii. 1CC181001652. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List, #3 Complaint; Summons 18-1-1652-10, #4 Civil Info Sheet) (apg, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Thanty Tham's against Michael L. Prather, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Thanty Tham's against Michael L. Prather, filed by Thanty Tham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Certificate of Service)(Fieman, Jason) Modified on 11/12/2019 to remove duplicate parties (emt, ).
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (ens) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed.
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(ens)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 1/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(ens)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00606 RT on all further pleadings. (ens)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thanty Tham from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-1652-10. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2286786), filed by Thanty Tham.(Fieman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kham v. Tham, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Thanty Tham
Represented By: Jason H. Fieman
Represented By: Donna A.O. Yoshimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnary Kham
Represented By: Arthur Yakop Park
Represented By: Travis Anthony Yu
Represented By: Patricia Kim Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Kham
Represented By: Arthur Yakop Park
Represented By: Travis Anthony Yu
Represented By: Patricia Kim Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Doe Corporations, Partnerships and Other Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Michael L. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?