Souza v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Ululani Souza, Colleen U. Purdy and Colleen U. Souza
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, State of Hawaii, City and County of Honolulu, Puna Wai Rest Stop, Next Step, Department of Health, State of Hawaii, Corporation Counsel, City and County of Honolulu, Department of Agriculture, State of Hawaii, Attorney General, State of Hawaii, Department of Transportation Services, City and County of Honolulu, IHS Women's and Children's Shelter and Department of Human Services, State of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2019cv00608
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 10 Set Hearings, EO continuing the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, has been served by First Class Mail to Colleen Ululani Souza on 12/26/202012/26/2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jp) Modified on 12/26/2019 (jp).
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9:00 a.m. on 1/06/2020 is continued to 9:00 a.m. on 3/05/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 2/27/2020. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/5/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; RESERVING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL UNDER THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000E-5(F)(1)(B) re #1 , #2 , #3 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/9/2019. On the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiff's Complaint, filed November 6, 2019, is HEREBY DISMISSED. The dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of an amended complaint that cures the defects identified in this Order. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file her amended complaint by January 27, 2020. The amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order. In addition, the Court HEREBY RESERVES RULING on Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed November 6, 2019. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, and if at least a portion of the amended complaint survives the screening process, the merits of the Application will be addressed. Finally, Plaintiff's Request for Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000e- 5(f)(1)(B), also filed November 6, 2019, is HEREBY DENIED. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Colleen Ululani Souza shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on December 10, 2019.
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 19-00608 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Colleen Ululani Souza shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 12, 2019.
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Magistrate Judge Trader will remain as the Magistrate Judge on this case. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Transmittal Letter from Plaintiff Colleen Ululani Souza, dated November 6, 2019. (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel Under the Civil Rights Act of 1964; 42 U.S.C. 2000e-5(f)(1)(B); Declaration in Support of Request - by Plaintiff Colleen Ululani Souza. (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Colleen Ululani Souza. (emt, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; (Proposed Summons); Jury Trial Waived against All Defendants - filed by Colleen Ululani Souza. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Summons) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souza v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ululani Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen U. Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen U. Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu, Puna Wai Rest Stop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Step
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation Counsel, City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Agriculture, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation Services, City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHS Women's and Children's Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Human Services, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?