Jass v. CherryRoad Technologies Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Haralds Jass
Defendant: CherryRoad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban and Nicholas Visco
Case Number: 1:2019cv00609
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Discussion had re: status of the case and the pending motion to dismiss set for 2/28/20 @ 9:30 a.m. before Judge Watson. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued to 3/31/20 @ 9:00 a.m. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/31/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Amaguin, Roman) Modified on 12/3/2019 (emt, ).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 REDACTION Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by CherryRoad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban, Nicholas Visco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Richard P. Sybert, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sybert, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on #5 Defendants Cherryroad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban and Nicholas Visco's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint is set for 2/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
November 22, 2019 ADVISORY ENTRY. 12.14 Personal Identifiers. Please be advised that an exhibit to document #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Haralds Jass's Complaint, Filed September 30, 2019 filed by Nicholas Visco, Jeremy Gulban, CherryRoad Technologies Inc, contains personal identifiers. To comply with the policy of the Judicial Conference of the United States and the E-Government Act of 2002, and to promote electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy and other legitimate interests, parties shall refrain from including, or shall partially redact when inclusion is necessary. The filing party may file a redacted version of exhibit. For e-filing purposes, the redacted exhibit shall be submitted with a caption cover page that includes counsel identification, the case number and a document caption. The filing party may select the filing event "Redacted Document" from the "Other Documents" filing category. When prompted by the system, please "link" the redacted exhibit to the Motion, ECF No. #5 . (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Haralds Jass's Complaint, Filed September 30, 2019 Richard P. Sybert appearing for Defendants Nicholas Visco, CherryRoad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (RESTRICTED to case participants) , #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (RESTRICTED to case participants) , #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Declaration Declaration of Richard P. Sybert, #5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Sybert, Richard) Modified on 11/26/2019 Exhibits A and B restricted to case participants. The filing party has filed redacted exhibits, see ECF No. #7 . (emt, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS FROM THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAII; 1CC191001529. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Jury Demand; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (as to Cherryroad Technologies, Inc.), #6 Notice to All Parties, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #8 Certificate of Service, #9 Notice of Electronic Filing Re: Notice of Removal) (emt, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 12/9/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT(COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00609 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicholas Visco, CherryRoad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 19-1-1529-09. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #: 0975-2287761 ), filed by Nicholas Visco, CherryRoad Technologies Inc., Jeremy Gulban. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (CV 19-1-1529-09, Complaint; Jury Demand; Summons) , #2 Declaration Declaration of Richard P. Sybert, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sybert, Richard) Docket text modified, receipt # added on 11/7/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jass v. CherryRoad Technologies Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haralds Jass
Represented By: Roman F. Amaguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CherryRoad Technologies Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Mia Dianne Obciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Gulban
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Mia Dianne Obciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Visco
Represented By: Richard P. Sybert
Represented By: Mia Dianne Obciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?