Maystrovich et al v. Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Merilee Maystrovich and Mark Maystrovich
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Jane Doe 1, Doe Corporations 1-5, GWR Wailea Property LLC, Jane Does 2-10, Doe Entities 1-5 and Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00614
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 1/6/2020. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR for a settlement conference, beginning in chambers, on October 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (jo)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 1/6/2020. (jo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC Withdrawal of Patricia M. NaPier as Counsel; Certificate of Service Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC. (Ma, Stacy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 1/06/2020. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 1/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 10/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference statements by 10/15/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported. 9:00 a..m - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zelman, Rachel)
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zelman, Rachel)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 12/18/2019. (jo)
November 29, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Second Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 18-1-0372 (1) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Complaint, #4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend Service Deadline and Pretrial Statement Deadline, #5 Stipulation For Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant GWR Wailea Property LLC dba Grand Wailea, #6 Acceptance of Service on Defendant Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC, #7 Defendant Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC's Notice of Removal, #8 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC re: First Request for Production of Documents and Things To Plaintiffs Merilee Maystrovich and Mark Maystrovich (Zelman, Rachel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC re: First Request For Answers To Interrogatories To Plaintiff Mark Maystrovich (Zelman, Rachel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC re: First Request For Answers To Interrogatories To Plaintiff Merilee Maystrovich (Zelman, Rachel)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint ; Certificate of Service by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC.(Ma, Stacy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Kelley, Fredrick) Modified on 11/18/2019 (emt, ).
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(ens)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 1/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(ens)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00614 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (ens)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. for Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC.. (Zelman, Rachel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC from Second Circuit Court, case number Civil 18-1-0373(1). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2288629), filed by Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant GWR Wailea Property LLC dba Grand Wailea, CV 18-1-0373(1)) #2 Exhibit B (Complaint; Summons, CV 18-1-0373(1)) , #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ma, Stacy) Docket text modified on 11/13/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maystrovich et al v. Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GWR Wailea Property LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waldorf=Astoria Management LLC
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Rachel Anna Zelman
Represented By: Patricia M. NaPier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merilee Maystrovich
Represented By: Fredrick M. Kelley
Represented By: Alexander Loftus Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Maystrovich
Represented By: Fredrick M. Kelley
Represented By: Alexander Loftus Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?