Keaulana vs. C.R. Bard, Inc.; et al.
Plaintiff: Eileen Keaulana and James K. Keaulana
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Davol, Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00619
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Case transferred to Southern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF (jo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 EO: Because no Defendant has appeared, the Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 1/13/2020 to 3/3/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 (CERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 45), MDL NO. 2846, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel (certified by the Southern District of Ohio) (jo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ENTRY ORDER re #12 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 45), MDL NO. 2846, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. (jo)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 (UNCERTIFIED) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO - 45), MDL NO. 2846, Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of August 2, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (jo)
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Bard Davol, Inc. (jo)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (jo)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Eileen Keaulana, James K. Keaulana. (Miyoshi, Philip)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Miyoshi, Philip)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Miyoshi, Philip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/13/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00619 SOM-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Miyoshi, Philip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2291075.), filed by James K. Keaulana, Eileen Keaulana .(Miyoshi, Philip) Modified on 11/14/2019 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keaulana vs. C.R. Bard, Inc.; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Davol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Keaulana
Represented By: Randall K. Hironaka
Represented By: Philip W. Miyoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Keaulana
Represented By: Randall K. Hironaka
Represented By: Philip W. Miyoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?