Ignacio v. Saul
Plaintiff: Merilyn B. Ignacio
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00628
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Moriyama, Rachel)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from the Clerk's Office to Diane C. Haar, Esq., re: #6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND COSTS, dated November 21, 2019 (jo)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul (jo)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES AND COSTS re: #3 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. (jo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00628 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Merilyn B. Ignacio (Haar, Diane)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF SUPPLEMENTAL SECURITY INCOME DETERMINATION against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Merilyn B. Ignacio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Docket Text Modified on 11/20/2019 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ignacio v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merilyn B. Ignacio
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?