Austin v. City and County of Honolulu
Plaintiff: Sonya Austin
Defendant: Other Doe Entities 1-10, City and County of Honolulu, John and Jane Does 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv00630
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Takahashi, Mitsuko)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00630 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Consent Election Form
December 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Takahashi, Mitsuko)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonya Austin. City and County of Honolulu served on 12/3/2019. (Luiz, Shawn)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City and County of Honolulu. (emt, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00630 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2294302.), filed by Sonya Austin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Jury Demand, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Luiz, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. City and County of Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Mitsuko Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Austin
Represented By: Shawn A. Luiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?