Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP v. Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC
Plaintiff: Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP
Defendant: Robin Coonen, Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC dba Blue Ocean Mariculture, Other Anonymous Persons John Does, John Does, Jane Does 1-15, Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC and Jane Does 16-30
Case Number: 1:2019cv00653
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 29 EO: COURT ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS TO MEET AND CONFER. The parties' stipulation or Defendants' letter must be submitted by February 14, 2020. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI) (afe)
January 30, 2020 Filing 28 EO: Pursuant to Pamela Bunn's request, and by agreement of counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/20 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 4/2/2020 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 3/27/20. Pro Hac Vice counsel may appear by telephone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 27 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Blue Ocean Mariculture LLC and Robin Coonen. (Bunn, Pamela)
January 27, 2020 Filing 26 Plaintiff Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Lam, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2020 (emt, ).
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint [Dkt. #1] Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Defendants Robin Coonen, Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Bunn, Pamela)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 EO: Mr. O Shane Balloun is allowed to appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/3/20 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(tbf, )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DIANA M. RUTOWSKI re #21 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/24/2020. (emt, )
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MICHAEL D. WEIL re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/24/2020. (emt, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Diana M. Rutowski Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2322691.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Defendants Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen (Bunn, Pamela)
January 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Weil Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2322680.Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Defendants Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen (Bunn, Pamela)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT BLUE OCEAN MARICULTURE LLC'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC answer due 1/27/2020; Robin Coonen answer due 1/27/2020. (emt, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #14 Defendants Blue Ocean Mariculture LLC and Robin Coonen's Ex Parte Application for First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Pamela W. Bunn on behalf of Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen. (Bunn, Pamela) Modified on 1/13/2020 to add linkage to underlying motion, text modified (emt, ).
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP as to Robin Coonen. (Lam, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP. (Lam, Michael)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP. Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, dba Blue Ocean Mariculture served on 12/17/2019. (Lam, Michael) Modified on 1/8/2020 (emt, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 EX PARTE Application for First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Pamela W. Bunn appearing for Defendants Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela W. Bunn, #2 Supplement Order Granting)(Bunn, Pamela)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Renewable Oceans Holdings LLC for Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC.. (Bunn, Pamela)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela W. Bunn on behalf of Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen on behalf of Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen. (Bunn, Pamela)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO O. SHANE BALLOUN re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 12/11/2019. (emt, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2302410.Michael L. Lam appearing for Plaintiff Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP (Lam, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/3/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC, Robin Coonen. (emt, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 19-00653 LEK-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP. (Lam, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Lam, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Lam, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP. (Lam, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2301339.), filed by Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP.(Lam, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP v. Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Coonen
Represented By: Michael David Weil
Represented By: Pamela W. Bunn
Represented By: Diana M. Rutowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC dba Blue Ocean Mariculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Anonymous Persons John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ocean Mariculture, LLC
Represented By: Michael David Weil
Represented By: Pamela W. Bunn
Represented By: Diana M. Rutowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 16-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kampachi Worldwide Holdings, LP
Represented By: Michael L. Lam
Represented By: O. Shane Balloun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?