AIG Property Casualty Company v. Anenberg
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Defendant: Neil Anenberg
Case Number: 1:2019cv00679
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Neil Anenberg ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Declaratory Judgment by Neil Anenberg. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wakuzawa, Bruce)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AIG Property Casualty Company. Neil Anenberg served on 1/7/2020. (Gallagher, J.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 02/19/2020 is CONTINUED to 3/31/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Neil Anenberg. (ens)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (ens)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 2/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(ens)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00679 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (ens)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for AIG Property Casualty Company.. (Gallagher, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by AIG Property Casualty Company re #1 Complaint, [Notice of Submission of Exhibit "2" to Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment] AIG Property Casualty Company. (Gallagher, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Gallagher, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Neil Anenberg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2308163.), filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallagher, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AIG Property Casualty Company v. Anenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIG Property Casualty Company
Represented By: J. Patrick Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Anenberg
Represented By: Bruce H. Wakuzawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?