Yoshimura v. Takahashi; et al.
Plaintiff: Tracy Yoshimura
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Glen I Takahashi, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Moana Yost, City and County Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi and City and County of Honolulu
Case Number: 1:2019cv00686
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment andn Injunctive Relief; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service filed by Moana Yost. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kohn, Robert)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by City and County of Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Yost, Moana)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief filed by Moana Yost. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kohn, Robert)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment andn Injunctive Relief; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service filed by City and County of Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jessica)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant Moana Yosts Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief and Certificate of Service filed by Tracy Yoshimura. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kiuchi, Keith)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Plaintiffs Memorandum In Opposition To Defendants Glen I. Takahashi, City Clerk of The City and County of Honolulu; Moana Yost; and the City and County of Honolulus Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief and Certificate of Service filed by Tracy Yoshimura. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kiuchi, Keith)
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 EO: Pursuant to the request of Counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Trader is CONTINUED to 03/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction:Motion Hearing is set for 6/5/2020 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition due 4/17/2020, reply due 5/1/2020. (shm)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: #10 Defendant Moana Yost's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief; and #11 Defendants Glen I. Takahashi, City Clerk of the City and County of Honolulu and the City and County of Honolulu's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief.Motions Hearing is set for 3/6/2020 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. (shm)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's Mtion For A Preliminary Injunction; Declaration of Tracy Yoshimura; Exhibits 1 - 9; Memorandum of law In Support of Motion; and Certificater of Service Keith M. Kiuchi appearing for Plaintiff Tracy Yoshimura (Attachments: #1 Declaration Tracy Yoshimura, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Memorandum, #12 Certificate of Service)(Kiuchi, Keith)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Yan-Kay Wong on behalf of City and County of Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi on behalf of City and County of Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi. (Wong, Jessica)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief Moana A. Yost appearing for Defendants City and County of Honolulu, Glen I. Takahashi (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo in Support of motion, #2 Certificate of Counsel, #3 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #4 Exhibit 1 of 29, #5 Exhibit 2 of 29, #6 Exhibit 3 of 29, #7 Exhibit 4 of 29, #8 Exhibit 5 of 29, #9 Exhibit 6 of 29, #10 Exhibit 7 of 29, #11 Exhibit 8 of 29, #12 Exhibit 9 of 29, #13 Exhibit 10 of 29, #14 Exhibit 11 of 29, #15 Exhibit 12 of 29, #16 Exhibit 13 of 29, #17 Exhibit 14 of 29, #18 Exhibit 15 of 29, #19 Exhibit 16 of 29, #20 Exhibit 17 of 29, #21 Exhibit 18 of 29, #22 Exhibit 19 of 29, #23 Exhibit 20 of 29, #24 Exhibit 21 of 29, #25 Exhibit 22 of 29, #26 Exhibit 23 of 29, #27 Exhibit 24 of 29, #28 Exhibit 25 of 29, #29 Exhibit 26 of 29, #30 Exhibit 27 of 29, #31 Exhibit 28 of 29, #32 Exhibit 29 of 29, #33 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Yost, Moana) Modified on 1/17/2020 (emt, ).
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment andn Injunctive Relief; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Certificate of Service Robert M. Kohn appearing for Defendant Moana Yost (Kohn, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Yoshimura. Moana Yost served on 12/31/2019. (Kiuchi, Keith)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Yoshimura. City and County of Honolulu served on 12/31/2019. (Kiuchi, Keith)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Yoshimura. Glen I. Takahashi served on 12/31/2019. (Kiuchi, Keith)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Tracy Yoshimura. (Kiuchi, Keith)
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 2/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00686 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief; Exhibt 1-4 and Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2310377.), filed by Tracy Yoshimura. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Summons)(Kiuchi, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoshimura v. Takahashi; et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen I Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moana Yost
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County Honolulu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen I. Takahashi
Represented By: Jessica Yan-Kay Wong
Represented By: Moana A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Jessica Yan-Kay Wong
Represented By: Moana A. Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Yoshimura
Represented By: Keith M. Kiuchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?