David v. Bhanot
Plaintiff: Hannah David
Defendant: Amy Leskovic, Shaylene Iseri, William Keahiolalo, Kris Kosa-Correia, Jane and/or John Does 1-25, Todd Raybuck, Pankaj Bhanot and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00002
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Entry of Default Eric A. Seitz appearing for Plaintiff Hannah David (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric A. Seitz, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 [Proposed] Entry of Default, #5 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric)
February 18, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by William R.K. Awong on behalf of Pankaj Bhanot, Amy Leskovic (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Awong, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 33 Defendants Pankaj Bhanot, Aimee Leskovic and Kris Kosa-Correia In Her Official Capacity's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pankaj Bhanot, Kris Kosa-Correia, Amy Leskovic. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Inagaki, Caron)
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TODD RAYBUCK TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/12/2020. Todd Raybuck's answer due 3/18/2020Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 09:15 AM on 4/20/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER(jo)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Seitz, Eric)
February 12, 2020 Filing 30 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/3/20, before Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. PP. - 4 (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
February 12, 2020 Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings STATUS CONF. held on 1/3/20, before Judge J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Court Reporter - Cynthia Fazio, Telephone number - (808) 541-2063, Email Address - cf@hid.uscourts.gov. PP. - 22 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2020.
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Seitz, Eric)
February 7, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. Pankaj Bhanot served on 2/7/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. Shaylene Iseri served on 1/10/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. William Keahiolalo served on 1/10/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. Todd Raybuck served on 1/27/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. Amy Leskovic served on 1/13/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hannah David. Kris Kosa-Correia served on 1/14/2020. (Yolken, Kevin)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TEMPORARILY UNSEALING HEARING FOR LIMITED PURPOSE OF PREPARING TRANSCRIPT - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/3/2020. (jo)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Motion held on January 7, 2020, before Judge J. Michael Seabright. Court Reporter/Transcriber - Ann Matsumoto, Telephone number - 808 541-2061,Email Address - am@hid.uscourts.gov. PP. - 31 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2020. (Matsumoto, Ann)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Eric A. Seitz on behalf of Hannah David. (Seitz, Eric)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 Letter dated January 13, 2020 to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Eric A. Seitz, Esq. *Viewing Restricted to Case Participants ONLY* (jo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 Email dated January 10, 2020 to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Caron M. Inagaki, Esq. *Viewing Restricted to Case Participants ONLY* (jo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 16 Email dated January 8, 2020 to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Caron M. Inagaki, Esq. *Viewing Restricted to Case Participants ONLY* (jo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 15 Letter dated January 6, 2020 to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Eric A. Seitz, Esq. *Viewing Restricted to Case Participants ONLY* (jo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter dated January 6, 2020 to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Caron M. Inagaki, Esq. *Viewing Restricted to Case Participants ONLY* (jo)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 EP: #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction held.Defendant Shaylene Iseri, participated by telephone.Discussion held.Oral arguments heard.Court informed that a Temporary Foster Care hearing is set before the Family Court of the Third Circuit at the South Kohala District Court tomorrow. If the hearing does not conclude by tomorrow, Mr. Seitz shall update the Court by email to the Seabright Orders box by 01/08/2020. If there is a ruling or resolution, Mr. Seitz shall submit a detailed filing by 01/09/2020.Defendant State of Hawaii is ordered to make a good faith effort to arrange for visitation today. Visitation can be supervised and will be scheduled before 8:00 pm tonight. (Court Reporter Ann Matsumoto.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pankaj Bhanot, Kris Kosa-Correia, Amy Leskovic. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian T. Tsuda, #2 Declaration of Shawn Lathrop, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Inagaki, Caron) Pursuant to Court Order, ECF 11 , Additional SEALED attachment added on 1/6/2020: #5 Exhibit A (jo) Docket Text Modified on 1/8/2020 (jo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 EO: Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Exhibit A Under Seal, ECF No. #10 , is GRANTED, subject to the court's review of the exhibit. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 EX PARTE Motion DEFENDANTS PANKAJ BHANOT, AIMEE LESKOVIC AND KRIS KOSA-CORREIA IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBIT A (KAUAI POLICE REPORTS INCIDENT NOS. 19-25072 AND 19-25113) UNDER SEAL Caron M. Inagaki appearing for Defendants Pankaj Bhanot, Kris Kosa-Correia, Amy Leskovic (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Caron M. Inagaki, #2 Certificate of Service)(Inagaki, Caron)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 EP: Status conference held.Defendant Shaylene Iseri, participated by telephone.Mr. Ian Tsuda, Deputy Attorney General, participated by telephone.Ms. Karen Inagaki, Deputy Attorney General, request to seal the courtroom - For reasons stated on the record, granted, limited to discussion of confidential reports and records.[3:45 pm - 3:47 pm] - SEALED discussion held.Court ordered the Defendant State of Hawaii to submit a memorandum by 12:00 noon on 01/06/2020 regarding its efforts to make arrangements for supervised visitation.Defendant State of Hawaii to file a Response by 12:00 noon on 01/06/2020. #3 Hearing of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is set for 01/07/2020 at 2:15 pm before the Honorable J. Michael Seabright.(Court Reporter Cynthia Fazio.) (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 EO: Status Conference is set for 01/03/2020 at 03:30 PM in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 3/2/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00002 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Eric A. Seitz appearing for Plaintiff Hannah David (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF ERIC A. SEITZ, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Memorandum, #7 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric) Entry Modified (Exhibit 3 restricted to case participants) on 1/3/2020 (jo)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Seitz, Eric)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2311754.), filed by Hannah David. (Attachments: #1 VERIFICATION OF HANNAH DAVID, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David v. Bhanot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Leskovic
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Represented By: William R.K. Awong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaylene Iseri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Keahiolalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Kosa-Correia
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Represented By: William R.K. Awong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and/or John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Raybuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pankaj Bhanot
Represented By: Caron M. Inagaki
Represented By: William R.K. Awong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah David
Represented By: Gina May Szeto-Wong
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Represented By: Jonathan M.F. Loo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?