Fallen Productions, Inc. et al v. Beasor et al
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc., Venice PI, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., Wicked Nevada, LLC, LHF Productions, Inc., Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, Headhunter, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Criminal Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc. and Millennium Funding, Inc.,
Defendant: Harry Beasor and DOE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 25 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/02/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 04/01/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Scheduling Conference Statement are due by 03/25/2020. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 EO: Motion Hearing is set for 04/16/2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER for ECF #22 First MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS . (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement . (Culpepper, Kerry) Modified on 2/24/2020 (emt, ).
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 First MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiffs Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Headhunter, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Rambo V Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of counsel)(Culpepper, Kerry)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT HARRY BEASOR PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIVL.P. 41 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 2/21/2020. All claims against Defendant Harry Beasor are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Claims remain against Defendant DOE. Harry Beasor terminated. (emt, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 EO: On 2/7/20, Plaintiff LHF Productions, Inc. and Defendant Harry Beasor submitted a signed "Stipulation for Order to Spectrum to Produce Identifying Information for Subscribers and Order" to the Court ("Stipulation"). In the Stipulation, Defendant Beasor joins in Plaintiff LHF Productions' request for early discovery. The parties attached a proposed order granting the relief Plaintiff requests in its "Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(F) Conference" ("Ex Parte Motion") (ECF No. 12). The Court granted Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion on 2/18/20 (ECF No. 19) without considering the Stipulation. Accordingly, the Stipulation is moot. However, even if the Stipulation was considered, the Court must find good cause to grant the Ex Parte Motion and may not only rely on the parties' stipulation to grant early discovery. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/18/2020. (emt, )
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FIRST JOINT STIPULATION TO (1) EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT HARRY BEASOR TO SERVE ANSWER AND/OR RESPONSIVE MOTION TO COMPLAINT AND (2) EXTEND TIME TO SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 2/12/2020. Harry Beasor answer due 3/16/2020. (emt, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan M. Harada on behalf of Harry Beasor on behalf of Harry Beasor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harada, Bryan)
February 11, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Please be advised that Document #16 Notice of Appearance filed by Harry Beasor, reflects the appearance of more than one attorney. To ensure that all counsel are properly associated to the docket, it is recommended that each attorney file individual Notices of Appearance using their respective CM/ECF login credentials. (emt, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Chen on behalf of Harry Beasor on behalf of Harry Beasor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chen, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) AND LR 26.1; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
January 20, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Venice PI, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,. Harry Beasor served on 1/14/2020. (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 6, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright have been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights at U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, DC 20559-6000 on January 6, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00004 JAO -RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 EX PARTE Motion FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE Kerry S. Culpepper appearing for Plaintiff LHF Productions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum re motion)(Culpepper, Kerry)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Consent Election Form
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Headhunter, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Rambo V Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC Copyright Report Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Headhunter, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Rambo V Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC. (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright . Please submit to the U.S. District Court Clerk's Office using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/2/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Harry Beasor. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00004 RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Criminal Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Headhunter, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Rambo V Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Voltage Development NCCF, LLC for Headhunter, LLC; Corporate Parent Voltage Productions, LLC for Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, TBV Productions, LLC, Venice PI, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC; Corporate Parent Millennium IP, Inc. for Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,, LHF Productions, Inc.; Corporate Parent Millennium Funding, Inc for Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., HB Productions, Inc., Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., Rambo V Productions, Inc... (Culpepper, Kerry)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Harry Beasor, DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2312372.), filed by Venice PI, LLC, HB Productions, Inc., Criminal Productions, Inc., Fallen Productions, Inc., Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, Hunter Killer Productions, Inc., LHF Productions, Inc., TBV Productions, LLC, Headhunter, LLC, Definition Delaware, LLC, Wicked Nevada, LLC, Rambo V Productions, Inc., Millennium Funding, Inc.,, Colossal Movie Productions, LLC, Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fallen Productions, Inc. et al v. Beasor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice PI, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Definition Delaware, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colossal Movie Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rambo V Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wicked Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LHF Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bodyguard Productions, Inc.,
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Headhunter, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter Killer Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Criminal Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TBV Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fallen Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Millennium Funding, Inc.,
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Beasor
Represented By: Daniel M. Chen
Represented By: Bryan M. Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?