Emrit v. National Football League et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Defendant: Washington Redskins, Daniel Snyder and National Football League
Case Number: 1:2020cv00008
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND RESERVING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #1 , #3 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/28/2020. On the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiff's Complaint, filed January 6, 2020, is HEREBY DISMISSED. The dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of an amended complaint that cures the defects identified in this Order. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file his amended complaint by April 13, 2020. The amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order. In addition, the Court HEREBY RESERVES RULING on Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed January 6, 2020. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint, and if at least a portion of the amended complaint survives the screening process, the merits of the Application will be addressed. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on March 2, 2020.
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/03/2020 is CONTINUED to 05/04/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porterbefore MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Pro Se Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/3/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Ronald Satish Emrit was served by by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on January 7, 2020.
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Ronald Satish Emrit. (emt, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Ronald Satish Emrit. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emrit v. National Football League et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Redskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Satish Emrit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?