Fernandez v. Pono Ventures, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julia Fernandez
Defendant: Pono Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00026
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 EO: Pursuant to the Notice of Settlement [ECF 9], filed 3/16/20, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/23/20 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader along with all other dates and deadlines. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice due 4/20/20. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on 3/17/2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Counsel shall provide contact information to the Courtroom Manager, Juliet Parker, by emailing same to Juliet_Parker@hid.uscourts.gov no later than 3 business days prior to the court proceeding. In certain cases, however, the physical presence of counsel, parties and party representatives at a particular court proceeding may be required at the discretion of Magistrate Judge Trader. Unless specifically ordered by the court, mandatory chambers copies of filings and other documents are not required for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader. Confidential settlement conference statements should be emailed to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Julia Fernandez of Settlement Julia Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brackett, Justin)
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julia Fernandez. Pono Ventures, Inc. served on 1/23/2020 (via priority mail) . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 1/30/2020 (emt, ).
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/23/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pono Ventures, Inc. (emt, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00026 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Pono Ventures, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2319985.), filed by Julia Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Fernandez v. PONO, #5 Supplement Verification of Complaint - Julia Fernandez)(Brackett, Justin) Modified on 1/21/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Pono Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Fernandez
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pono Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?