Fernandez v. FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Sonja Fernandez
Defendant: Jeff Martin, FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-25 and Theresa Rubinoff
Case Number: 1:2020cv00031
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez's Response in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Rodney Bridgers, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(Bridgers, Rodney) Docket Entry/Text Modified on 3/16/2020 (jo)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/4/2020. (jo)
March 3, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had.Court confirms Defendant Jeff Martins Motion to Dismiss [ECF 12] is pending hearing before District Judge Gillmor on 04/13/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 05/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader.Court to issue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 05/18/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 05/06/2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Settlement Conference statements due by 02/09/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 03/19/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
March 3, 2020 Filing 22 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had.Court confirms Defendant Jeff Martins Motion to Dismiss [ECF 12] is pending hearing before District Judge Gillmor on 04/13/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 05/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader.Court to issue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 05/18/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 05/06/2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Settlement Conference is set for 02/16/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference statements due by 02/09/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 3/19/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 28, 2020 Filing 21 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney)
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney)
February 20, 2020 Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Babcock, Barak)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:On February 14, 2020, Defendant Jeff Martin filed:DEFENDANT JEFF MARTIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS (ECF No. #12 )Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez shall file her Opposition on or before Monday, March 9, 2020.Defendant Jeff Martin shall file his Reply on or before Monday, March 23, 2020.A hearing on Defendant Jeff Martin's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #12 ) shall be held on Monday, April 13, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.(rls, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 EO: On 2/14/20, Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez filed a Motion to Continue February 24, 2020 Scheduling Conference ("Motion") (ECF No. 13). Plaintiff explains that her counsel is scheduled for surgery on 2/20/20. Plaintiff seeks a continuance of the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 02/24/20. Plaintiff's counsel anticipates he will recover from surgery and will be able to resume normal duties the week of 03/02/20. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is continued from 02/24/20 at 9:00 a.m. to 03/03/2020 at 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez's RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Sonja Fernandez. (Bridgers, Rodney) Docket Text Modified on 2/19/2020 (jo)
February 18, 2020 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement - Amended. (Babcock, Barak)
February 17, 2020 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement Of Defendants FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. and Jeff Martin. (Babcock, Barak)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; Declaration of Rodney Bridgers; Certificate of Service Rodney Parry Bridgers, Jr appearing for Plaintiff Sonja Fernandez (Bridgers, Rodney) Modified on 2/18/2020 (emt, ).
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Joseph B. Reafsnyder appearing for Defendant Jeff Martin (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Reafsnyder, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOSEPH B. REAFSNYDER re: #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/31/2020. Joseph B. Reafsnyder, Esq. (Firm: Federal Express Corporation Legal Department) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services Inc. and Jeffrey B. Martin (jo)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BARAK J. BABCOCK re: #6 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/31/2020. Barak J. Babcock, Esq. (Firm: Federal Express Corporation Legal Department) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services Inc. and Jeffrey B. Martin (jo)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant Jeff Martin's Consent to Removal by Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. filed by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Wang, Sarah)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.. (Wang, Sarah)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Joseph B. Reafsnyder) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2325000.Sarah O. Wang appearing for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., Jeff Martin (Wang, Sarah)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Barak J. Babcock) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2324976.Sarah O. Wang appearing for Defendants FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., Jeff Martin (Wang, Sarah)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; CV 1CCV190002274 (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Re: JIMS, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jo)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00031 HG-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for FedEx Corporate Services, Inc... (Wang, Sarah)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al. Defendant FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Federal Court from First Circuit, case number 19-0002274. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2322719), filed by FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Wang, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. FedEx Corporate Services, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Fernandez
Represented By: Rodney P. Bridgers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporate Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah O. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Rubinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?