Tylor v. Hey Whatz What LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Hey Whatz What LLC, Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, ADA Property Management LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Y. Yamamoto on behalf of ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management on behalf of ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yamamoto, Randall)
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ADA Property Management LLC, ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2020 Filing 13 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/28/2020 is CONTINUED to 6/08/2020 at 09:30AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 03/30/2020 is CONTINUED to 4/28/2020 at 09:15AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 Consent Election Form
February 7, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright and #1 Complaint shall be served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 on February 7, 2020. (emt, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action of Appeal Regarding a Copyright. For e-filing purposes, select the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/30/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hey Whatz What LLC., ADA Property Management LLC. (emt, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00051 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Street, J.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2327416.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Hey Whatz What LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hey Whatz What LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Property Management LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADA Property Management LLC dba HI Pacific Property Management
Represented By: Jeffrey Hu
Represented By: Randall Y. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Represented By: Dane Kristofer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?