Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Sustainable Coastlines Hawaii, Surfrider Foundation and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler and Mike Stoker
Case Number: 1:2020cv00056
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay Until July 29 and Request for Telephonic Status Conference At or Around June 1 Sydney A. Menees appearing for Defendants Mike Stoker, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from EPA to HDOH)(Menees, Sydney)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sydney A. Menees on behalf of Mike Stoker, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler on behalf of Mike Stoker, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler. (Menees, Sydney)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler (jo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office (jo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Mike Stoker (jo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (jo)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Attorney General (jo)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons (Proposed) (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00056 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Surfrider Foundation, Sustainable Coastlines Hawaii. (Phillips, Maxx)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400. 00, 0975-2329069), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Maxx) Modified on 2/5/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Sydney A. Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Sydney A. Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Stoker
Represented By: Sydney A. Menees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sustainable Coastlines Hawaii
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surfrider Foundation
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Maxx Elizabeth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?