JTH Tax LLC v. D'Souza et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service and JTH Tax LLC
Defendant: Norma C D'Souza, Owen H D'Souza, Picasso Trigger Company LLC, Owen H. D'Souza and Norma C. D'Souza
Case Number: 1:2020cv00087
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 EO: At Plaintiff's request to allow sufficient time to complete service on Defendant, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/27/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 05/28/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 05/21/2020. Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, the MOTION/CONFERECE hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
March 20, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark has been served by First Class Mail to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on March 20, 2020. (emt, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by JTH Tax LLC JTH Tax LLC. (Obciana, Mia) Modified on 3/11/2020 (emt, ).
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Obciana, Mia)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Obciana, Mia)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Obciana, Mia)
February 28, 2020 Filing 6 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. For e-filing purposes, select the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the Director. (emt, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00087 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages against All Plaintiffs Owen H. D'Souza, Norma C. D'Souza, Picasso Trigger Company LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2338115.), filed by JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Supplement Verification)(Obciana, Mia) Modified on 2/25/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax LLC v. D'Souza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC dba Liberty Tax Service
Represented By: Mia Dianne Obciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC
Represented By: Mia Dianne Obciana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma C D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen H D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Picasso Trigger Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen H. D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma C. D'Souza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?