In Re: Sarah Margaret Taylor
In Re: In The Matter Of:
Appellant: Sarah Margaret Taylor
Case Number: 1:2020cv00091
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #3 ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS shall be served by First Class Mail to Sarah Margaret Taylor at the address of record on March 20, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/19/2020. (emt, )
February 26, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the 2 Notice of Case Assignment has been served by First Class Mail to Sarah Margaret Taylor at the address of record on February 26, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00091 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL TO DISTRICT COURT FROM U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT: APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Appellant Sarah Margaret Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Sarah Margaret Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In The Matter Of:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sarah Margaret Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?