Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company v. Muraoka
Plaintiff: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Duane Muraoka and Douglas Muraoka
Case Number: 1:2020cv00092
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2020 Filing 11 EO: Counsel Jeffrey H. K. Sia informs the Court that he has been in contact with an attorney for Defendant Muraoka indicating that the Defendant would waive formal service of process, therefore request that the conference be continued. The request is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/27/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 06/29/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 06/22/2020. Counsel Jeffrey H. K. Sia to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Douglas Muraoka. (emt, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against Douglas Muraoka, filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Summons)(Sia, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sia, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Duane Muraoka (jo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 4/27/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00092 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Sia, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Duane Muraoka ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2339571.), filed by Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sia, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company v. Muraoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Muraoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Muraoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mesa Underwriters Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Steven L. Goto
Represented By: Jeffrey H.K. Sia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?