Reyes et al v. Crane Company et al
Plaintiff: Melveen Leed and Miguel Reyes, Jr.
Defendant: Crane Company, Ingersoll Rand Co. and Does 1 to 25
Not Classified By Court: Keith Hunter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00115
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melveen Leed, Miguel Reyes, Jr (Re: FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [OF MIGUEL REYES, JR.] UPON ORAL EXAMINATION BY VIDEOCONFERENCE AND BY VIDEOTAPE FOR PERPETUATION OF TESTIMONY, DATED MAY 1, 2020) (Aoki, Allison)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION TO CONDUCT THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF MIGUEL REYES, JR., BY VIDEOCONFERENCE by Melveen Leed, Miguel Reyes, Jr. (DeRobertis, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melveen Leed, Miguel Reyes, Jr (Re: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [OF MIGUEL REYES, JR.] UPON ORAL EXAMINATION BY VIDEOCONFERENCE, DATED APRIL 24, 2020) (Aoki, Allison)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE not held.Discussion had.By agreement, Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is rescheduled to and Telephone Conference is set for 07/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties advise mediation with Keith Hunter is scheduled for 05/27/2020 and anticipated to address all parties/claims. Court to issue Mediation Order.Courtroom Manager to provided call-in instructions. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
April 13, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #19 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR shall be served by First Class Mail to Keith Hunter at Dispute Prevention & Resolution, Inc., 1003 Bishop St Ste 1155, Honolulu, Hi 96813 on April 14, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/13/2020. Keith Hunter added as Mediator. (emt, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Crane Co.'s Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on 3/23/2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Call-in information for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 04/13/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Participants to call in per the instructions below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby".5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melveen Leed, Miguel Reyes, Jr (Re: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND CANCELATION, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF DEPOSITION [OF MIGUEL REYES, JR.] UPON ORAL EXAMINATION BY VIDEOCONFERENCE AND VIDEOTAPE FOR PERPETUATION OF TESTIMONY, DATED MARCH 25, 2020) (Aoki, Allison)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeRobertis, L.) Modified on 4/7/2020 (emt, ).
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND CO.S RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Goodwin, Christopher)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melveen Leed, Miguel Reyes, Jr (Re: Notice of Taking Deposition [of Miguel Reyes, Jr.] Upon Oral Examination by Videoconference and Videotape for Perpetuation of Testimony, dated March 25, 2020) (Aoki, Allison)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
March 19, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Goodwin, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Co. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll Rand Co... (Goodwin, Christopher)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Crane Company by Ingersoll Rand Co.. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Other Defendants, #2 Answer to Cross-Claims filed by Other Defendants, #3 Certificate of Service)(Goodwin, Christopher)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant Crane Co.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint Filed February 11, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM Against All Other Defendants against Does 1 to 25, Ingersoll Rand Co. by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against All Other Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William) Modified on 3/20/2020 (emt, ).
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-20-0000216. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information System (JIMS), #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/13/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00115 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Crane Company. (Harstad, William)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company, #2 Supplement, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4a - Forman Affidavit Ex. A, A-5, A-7, #2 Exhibit 4b - Forman, Samuel Affidavit Ex. 1-16, A-19, A-24, A-26, A-27, #3 Exhibit 5 - State Court Notice of Notice of Removal, #4 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Company by Crane Company Additional Exhibits to Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3b - Sargent, David Affidavit Ex. G, H, J, L, #2 Exhibit 3c - Sargent, David Affidavit Ex. N, O, P, #3 Exhibit 3d - Sargent, David Affidavit Ex. R, T, U)(Harstad, William)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Company Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1442 & 1446 from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-20-0000216. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2346393), filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Friemoth Affidavit, Ex. A, B, C, D, #4 Exhibit 3a - Sargent, David Affidavit Ex. A, A-1, B, D)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. Crane Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melveen Leed
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Reyes, Jr.
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Represented By: Allison Mina Aoki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Co.
Represented By: Christopher S. Goodwin
Represented By: Robert S. Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Keith Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?