State Farm Insurance Companies v. Odagiri
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance Companies
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Tyson Odagiri
Case Number: 1:2020cv00125
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 17 EO: Regarding the #5 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 18, 2020: Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, the conference will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by State Farm Insurance Companies.(Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Tyson Odagiri. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Creps, Robert)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Tyson Odagiri. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Creps, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Tyson Odagiri's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against State Farm Insurance Companies by Tyson Odagiri. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Creps, Robert)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26(f). (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Creps on behalf of Tyson Odagiri on behalf of Tyson Odagiri. (Creps, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State Farm Insurance Companies. Tyson Odagiri waiver sent on 3/19/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Insurance Companies. (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tyson Odagiri. (emt, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00125 ACK-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Tsuchiyama, Thomas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Tyson Odagiri, filed by State Farm Insurance Companies. (0975-2349632, $ 400.00) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tsuchiyama, Thomas) Modified on 3/30/2020 to add receipt number (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Insurance Companies v. Odagiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Odagiri
Represented By: Robert A. Creps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Insurance Companies
Represented By: Thomas I. Tsuchiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?