Duff et al v. Kona Auto Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Duff and Curtis Duff
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Kona Auto Center, Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 EP: EARLY TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held.Plaintiffs Curtis and Teresa Duff and Kona Auto Client Representative, Nan Kitagawa are also present via telephone.Also participating is Alyssa Freeman as counsel for the Plaintiff (District of Hawaii Admission currently pending).Settlement discussions held with the parties via telephone.The parties have reached a tentative settlement.The Court sets a June 5, 2020 deadline to submit a stipulation for dismissal to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. If the parties hit any roadblocks that the Court can assist with, they may contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 or via email at bbb@hid.uscourts.gov, if they so wish further assistance in settlement with the Court.(KJM Chambers 9:55 - 10:40.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 1, 2020 Filing 22 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiffs Curtis Duff, Teresa Duff and Defenants Kona Auto Center, Inc., FCA US LLC Please continue to reflect case number CV 20-00142 KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
May 1, 2020 Filing 21 EO: Counsel Abigail Marie Holden has informed the Court that the parties are in agreement in setting an Early Settlement Conference. Therefore, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will be converted into an Early Settlement Conference and set for the same date of 05/04/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are to be submitted to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov no later than 3:00 p.m. today. The parties are to contact Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio via email at bbb@hid.uscourts.gov prior to the hearing, to provide the names of all participants, including any client(s) or client representative(s), along with best contact number at which the party can be reached at the time of this conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 Consent Election Form
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant Kona Auto Center, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint ; Certificate of Service by Kona Auto Center, Inc..(Holden, Abigail)
April 27, 2020 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiffs Curtis and Teresa Duff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Kona Auto Center, Inc.; Certificate of Service. (Holden, Abigail)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant FCA US LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Rask, Erik)
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #12 Consent Election Form Certificate of Service re: Defendant FCA US LLC's Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 12] (Rask, Erik)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 Consent Election Form
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Fricke on behalf of Kona Auto Center, Inc. (Fricke, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kona Auto Center, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent I. Kitagawa and Company, Limited for Kona Auto Center, Inc... (Holden, Abigail)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kona Auto Center, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Defendant Kona Auto Center, Inc.'s Consent to Defendant FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Court; Certificate of Service) Kona Auto Center, Inc.. (Holden, Abigail)
April 7, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant FCA US LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Filed February 13, 2020; Certificate of Service by FCA US LLC.(Rask, Erik)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Andrew Rask on behalf of FCA US LLC (Rask, Erik)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 First Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement [Dkt. 3], and Notice of Assignment to US Magistrate Judge [Dkt. 4] (Tilker, Brian) Docket Text Modified on 4/1/2020 (jo)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC. (Tilker, Brian)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30 AM on 5/4/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00142 KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC Defendant FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal of State Court Action to Federal Court from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 3CCV-20-0000065. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2353667), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian W. Tilker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B (part 1), #4 Exhibit B (part 2), #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Certificate of Service)(Tilker, Brian) Modified on 3/31/2020 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duff et al v. Kona Auto Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Brian W. Tilker
Represented By: Erik Andrew Rask
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Auto Center, Inc.
Represented By: Abigail Marie Holden
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Duff
Represented By: Jason R. Braswell
Represented By: Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Duff
Represented By: Jason R. Braswell
Represented By: Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?