NetOne, Inc. v. Panache Destination Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Netone, Inc.
Defendant: Panache Destination Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #10 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/5/2020. (emt, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 24 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] Amendment to #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint Table of Contents and Table of Authorities. by NetOne, Inc . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark) Modified on 5/31/2020 (emt, ).
May 27, 2020 Filing 23 [AMENDED DOCUMENT] Amendment to #11 Concise Statement of Facts, Certification of Word Count by NetOne, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark) Modified on 5/31/2020 (emt, ).
May 27, 2020 Filing 22 Responsive Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff NeOne, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint #19 filed by NetOne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark) Docket text modified on 5/31/2020 (emt, ).
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #10 Plaintiff Netone, Inc.'s MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint filed by NetOne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Carter, #2 Declaration of Mark G. Valencia, #3 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark) Docket text Modified on 5/31/2020 (emt, ).
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 Defendant Pacific Agenda Hawaii, Inc., d/b/a Panache Destination Management's FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed April 7, 2020 by Panache Destination Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Services Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Decor Contract)(Rogers, James) Modified on 5/18/2020 (emt, ).
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 CONCISE STATEMENT in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint filed by Panache Destination Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony Acosta, #2 Declaration of Harmony Cordeiro, #3 Declaration of Paul Dong, #4 Declaration of Debbie Murphy, #5 Declaration of J. Blaine Rogers, #6 Exhibit "1" - Email from J. Blaine Rogers to Mark Valencia, #7 Exhibit "2" - Services Contract, #8 Exhibit "3" - Decor Contract, #9 Exhibit "4" - Email from Anne Tart to Harmony Cordeiro, #10 Exhibit "5" - Email from Anne Tart to Anthony Acosta, #11 Exhibit "6" - NetOne's check for $129,179.12, #12 Exhibit "7" - NetOne's check for $121,112.90, #13 Exhibit "8" - Receipt for $9,646.64 to Hawaii Forest, #14 Exhibit "9" - Invoice from Island Breeze for $27,413.60)(Rogers, James)
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint filed by Panache Destination Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Word Count)(Rogers, James)
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 2, 2020 is CONTINUED to July 14, 2020 at 9:30AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Panache Destination Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Panache Destination Management for Panache Destination Management, Inc... (Hanakahi, Wendy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy F. Hanakahi on behalf of Panache Destination Management, Inc. on behalf of Panache Destination Management, Inc.. (Hanakahi, Wendy)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Pacific Agenda Hawaii, Inc., dba Panache Destination Management's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Panache Destination Management, Inc..(Rogers, James)
April 29, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NetOne, Inc. re #11 Concise Statement of Facts, #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint Amended Certificate of Service (Valencia, Mark) Modified on 5/1/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c), the Court will decide #10 Plaintiff Netone, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment On Count I of Complaint without a hearing. Briefing on the motion shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint filed by NetOne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Carter, #2 Declaration of Mark G. Valencia, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I of Complaint Mark G. Valencia appearing for Plaintiff NetOne, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Valencia, Mark)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint; Summons (Proof of Service) served on Panache Destination Management, Inc. Attn: Richard Garvin on April 18, 2020, filed by NetOne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Valencia, Mark)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 2, 2020 at 9:00 AM will be held by telephone. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Panache Destination Management, Inc. (jni)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 6/2/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00150 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Valencia, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netone, Inc.. (Valencia, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Panache Destination Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2356101.), filed by Netone, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Valencia, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NetOne, Inc. v. Panache Destination Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panache Destination Management, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy F. Hanakahi
Represented By: James Blaine Rogers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netone, Inc.
Represented By: Mark G. Valencia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?