Winkler v. Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Winkler
Defendant: Does 1-10, H. Scott Rotheiser, Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. and Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00151
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 23 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on June 1, 2020, the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 06/08/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby."5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants RealHome Services and Solutions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc. and Courtney Mitchell Read. (Holland, Kristin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 21 Scheduling Conference Statement PLAINTIFFS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST STIPULATION TO: (1) EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND (2) EXTEND DEADLINE TO SERVE INITIAL DISCLOSURES; ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/27/2020. Altisource Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/6/2020; Courtney Mitchell Read answer due 7/6/2020; Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/6/2020. (emt, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altisource Solutions, Inc., Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. for Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc.; Other Affiliate Altisource Portfolio Solutions, S.A. for Altisource Solutions, Inc... (Holland, Kristin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Maile Osika on behalf of Altisource Solutions, Inc., Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. on behalf of Altisource Solutions, Inc., Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Osika, Maile)
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Holland on behalf of Altisource Solutions, Inc., Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. on behalf of Altisource Solutions, Inc., Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc.. (Holland, Kristin)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT OF MEETING PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) AND LR 26.1. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Culpepper, Kerry)
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Winkler. Altisource Solutions, Inc. served on 4/21/2020; Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. served on 4/21/2020. (Culpepper, Kerry)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gabriel Winkler. Courtney Mitchell Read waiver sent on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Altisource Solutions, Inc. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for (1) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (2) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (3) DIGITAL COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against Does 1-10, Courtney Mitchell Read, Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc., Altisource Solutions, Inc., filed by Gabriel Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Declaration of Gabriel Winkler)(Culpepper, Kerry) Docket text modified on 4/20/2020 (emt, ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Winkler. Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. served on 4/9/2020. (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 8, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #1 Complaint and #3 Report on the Filing of Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.c. 20559-6000 on April 8, 2020. (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/8/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Courtney Mitchell Read. (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to H. Scott Rotheiser. (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. (emt, )
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00151 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Gabriel Winkler Copyright Report Gabriel Winkler. (Culpepper, Kerry)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Culpepper, Kerry)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) DIRECT COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; (2) CONTRIBUTORY COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; and (3) DIGITAL COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2356266.), filed by Gabriel Winkler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Declaration of Winkler, #22 Civil Cover Sheet)(Culpepper, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler v. Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Winkler
Represented By: Kerry S. Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Scott Rotheiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Mitchell Read
Represented By: Maile Osika
Represented By: Kristin L. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realhome Services and Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Maile Osika
Represented By: Kristin L. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Maile Osika
Represented By: Kristin L. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?