Nalu Kai Incorporated v. Girardin
Plaintiff: Nalu Kai Incorporated
Defendant: Damien Girardin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FILED APRIL 9, 2020 by Nalu Kai Incorporated - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/12/2020. This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. There are no remaining parties and/or issues. (jo)
May 11, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Please be advised that pursuant to LR41.1, docket entry #10 Notice of Dismissal requires the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Dismissal of Complaint Without Prejudice, Filed April 9, 2020 Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Miwa, Colin)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nalu Kai Incorporated. Damien Girardin served on 4/15/2020. (Miwa, Colin)
April 16, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #8 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark will be served by First Class Mail on April 17, 2020 to Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. (jo)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Nalu Kai Incorporated Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Miwa, Colin)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Damien Girardin. (jni)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 6/8/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T conference - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Miwa, Colin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00152 WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miwa, Colin)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2357096.), filed by Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miwa, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalu Kai Incorporated v. Girardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nalu Kai Incorporated
Represented By: Colin O. Miwa
Represented By: Martin E. Hsia
Represented By: Nathaniel Dang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Girardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?