City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP et al
Plaintiff: City & County of Honolulu
Defendant: Sunoco LP, Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation, BP America Inc., BHP PLC, Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Aloha Petroleum LLC, Chevron USA Inc., Phillips 66, Chevron Corp., Does 1 through 100, BHP Group Limited, ConocoPhillips Company, Shell Oil Company, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., BHP Hawaii Inc., Phillips 66 Company, Marathon Petroleum Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corp., BP PLC and ConocoPhillips
Case Number: 1:2020cv00163
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 93 EO: On June 9, 2020, the parties filed a joint response to the Court's May 1, 2020 Order. Dkt. No. 92. Therein, the parties provide an update on proceedings before the Ninth Circuit and ask for an extension to the stay in this case. For good cause shown, the Court agrees with the parties request for an extension to the stay on the terms set forth in the joint response. Accordingly, within 14 days of the events described in the joint response, id. at 3, the parties shall file a further joint status report with this Court. This case shall remain stayed pending the filing and consideration of said status report, except for the filing and adjudication of pro hac vice applications and changes or substitutions of counsel. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
June 9, 2020 Filing 92 RESPONSE Joint Response to 80 May 1, 2020 Order filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 6/9/2020 to add linkage to order (emt, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
May 14, 2020 Filing 90 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader from Melvyn M. Miyagi, Esq., dated April 24, 2020, Re: Request to continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference currently set for May 18, 2020. (emt, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 89 EO: Court vacates Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 05/18/2020 at 8:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
May 13, 2020 Filing 88 EO: Court advances Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 8:45 a.m. on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on April 16, 2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Call-in information for the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Participants to call in per the instructions below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby".5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JONATHAN W. HUGHES re #84 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/7/2020. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW T. HEARTNEY re #83 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/7/2020. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOHN D. LOMBARDO re #82 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/7/2020. (emt, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Jonathan W. Hughes] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2367243.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Matthew T. Heartney] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2367242.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
May 5, 2020 Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [John D. Lombardo] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2367239.Lisa A. Bail appearing for Defendants BP America Inc., BP PLC (Bail, Lisa)
May 4, 2020 Filing 81 EO: While these proceedings are stayed, (Dkt. No. 80), the parties may continue to file motions to appear pro hac vice under LR 83.1(c) and the Court will decide these motions in due course, including any such motions that may be pending at this time. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
May 1, 2020 EO: All further proceedings and deadlines are hereby stayed pending the Ninth Circuit's resolution of County of San Mateo, et al. v. Chevron Corp., et al., Nos. 18-15499, 18-15502, 18-15503, and 18-16376 (9th Cir.); City of Oakland, et al. v. B.P. PLC, et al., No. 18-16663 (9th Cir.) [Dkt. No. 80]. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
May 1, 2020 Filing 80 EO: Having reviewed both Defendants' joint brief, (Dkt. No. 78), and Plaintiff's brief, (Dkt. No. 79), in response to this Court's Entering Order, (Dkt. No. 24), the Court concludes that a stay of these proceedings is warranted, pending the resolution of two appeals argued before the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals on February 5, 2020. See County of San Mateo, et al. v. Chevron Corp., et al., Nos. 18-15499, 18-15502, 18-15503, and 18-16376 (9th Cir.); City of Oakland, et al. v. B.P. PLC, et al., No. 18-16663 (9th Cir.). Collectively, these appeals are likely to address some, and possibly all, of the issues that the parties would present in the motion to remand that they anticipate filing, together with some of the issues that would undoubtedly be presented in various motions to dismiss that the parties also anticipate filing. Therefore, pending the Ninth Circuit's resolution of San Mateo and Oakland, all further proceedings and deadlines in this matter are hereby STAYED , including the filing of a motion to remand and any pleading or motion in response to the complaint. No later than fourteen (14) days after the Ninth Circuit issues a decision in both San Mateo and Oakland, the parties are directed to submit a plan--jointly, if possible, and separately, if not--that addresses the various scheduling and other issues contemplated by Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 and related local rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk) Modified on 5/6/2020 (emt, ).
April 30, 2020 Filing 79 [Brief] Plaintiffs' Brief Regarding Pending Appeals and Propriety of Stay . re 24 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(Sher, Victor) Docket text modified on 5/5/2020 (emt, ).
April 30, 2020 Filing 78 [Joint Brief ] Defendants Response to Briefing Order re 24 Link. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Docket text modified on 5/4/2020 (emt, ).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW B. ALLEN re #71 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/30/2020. (emt, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MEGAN H. BERGE re #70 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/30/2020. (emt, )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO J. SCOTT JANOE re #69 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/30/2020. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BOAZ S. MORAG re #61 , #65 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/29/2020. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO VICTOR L. HOU re #60 , #64 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/29/2020. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BREON S. PEACE re #59 , #63 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/29/2020. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Matthew B. Allen Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364817.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Megan H. Berge Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364810.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice J. Scott Janoe Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364791.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Defendants Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP (Heihre, C.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heihre, C.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Michi Momose on behalf of Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP on behalf of Aloha Petroleum LLC, Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Momose, Michi)
April 29, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Michael Heihre on behalf of Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP, Aloha Petroleum LLC on behalf of Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Sunoco LP, Aloha Petroleum LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Heihre, C.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 65 [Application] AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (B. MORAG) re #61 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery) Modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 29, 2020 Filing 64 [Application] AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (V. HOU) re #60 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery) Modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 29, 2020 Filing 63 [Application] AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (B. PEACE) re #59 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Bronster, Margery) Modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Rose, Crystal)
April 28, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Boaz Morag, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364309.Rex Y. Fujichaku appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Fujichaku, Rex) Modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Victor Hou, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364303.Rex Y. Fujichaku appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Fujichaku, Rex) Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Breon S. Peace, Esq] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2364296.Rex Y. Fujichaku appearing for Defendants BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B, #4 Proposed Order)(Fujichaku, Rex) Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC identifying Other Affiliate BHP PLC for BHP PLC; Other Affiliate BHP Hawaii Inc. for BHP Hawaii Inc.; Corporate Parent BHP Group Limited for BHP Group Limited.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujichaku, Rex)
April 28, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Rex Y. Fujichaku, [Margery S. Bronster and Kevin A. Morris of the law firm Bronster Fujichaku Robbins, and Breon S. Peace, Victor L. Hou and Boaz S. Morag of the law firm Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP] on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC on behalf of BHP Group Limited, BHP Hawaii Inc., BHP PLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fujichaku, Rex) Docket text modified on 4/29/2020 (emt, ).
April 28, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Wong Black on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Black, Claire)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SEAN C. GRIMSLEY re #52 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/28/2020. (emt, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL R. BRODY re #51 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/28/2020. (emt, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JAMESON R. JONES re #50 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/28/2020. (emt, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Sean C. Grimsley Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2363668.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
April 27, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel R. Brody Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2363665.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
April 27, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Jameson R. Jones Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2363649.Crystal K. Rose appearing for Defendants ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company (Rose, Crystal)
April 27, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal K. Rose [Adrian L. Lavarias, David A. Morris of the law firm Bays Lung Rose & Holma; Jameson R. Jones, Daniel R. Brody, and Sean C. Grimsley, of law firm Bartlit Beck LLP] on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company on behalf of ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Rose, Crystal) Modified on 4/28/2020 (emt, ).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO THEODORE J. BOUTROUS, JR. re #40 , #41 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2020. (emt, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO CAITLIN GRUSAUSKAS re #39 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2020. (emt, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO YAHONNES CLEARY re #38 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2020. (emt, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL J. TOAL re #37 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2020. (emt, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. re #36 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/27/2020. (emt, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn T. Melchinger on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Melchinger, Glenn)
April 24, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by John-Anderson L. Meyer on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Meyer, John-Anderson)
April 24, 2020 Filing 41 [MOTION to Amend/Correct] (re-submission) #40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., of Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2363069. Melvyn M. Miyagi appearing for Defendants Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Docket text modified on 4/27/2020 (emt, ).
April 24, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., of Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2363069.Melvyn M. Miyagi appearing for Defendants Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Document is not signed. The filing party resubmitted the Pro Hac Vice Application, see ECF No. #41 .
April 24, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Caitlin Grusauskas Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2362886.Paul Alston appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Alston, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Yahonnes Cleary Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2362885.Paul Alston appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Alston, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Daniel Toal Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2362884.Paul Alston appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Alston, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Theodore V. Wells Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2362882.Paul Alston appearing for Defendants Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation (Alston, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Mobil Corporation for ExxonMobil Oil Corporation.. (Alston, Paul)
April 24, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alston on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Alston, Paul)
April 23, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hoftiezer on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Hoftiezer, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa W. Munger on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Munger, Lisa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP America Inc., BP PLC identifying Corporate Parent BP PLC for BP America Inc... (Bail, Lisa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Bail on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC on behalf of BP America Inc., BP PLC. (Bail, Lisa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 29 EO: Having further considered the parties' April 17, 2020 First Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits (Dkt. No. 9), and considered the parties' April 21, 2020 Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Dkt. No. 27), and in light of this Court's April 20, 2020 Entering Order (Dkt. No. 24) directing the filing of certain briefing from all parties by April 30, 2020, the Court orders as follows:1. The deadline for filing a Motion to Remand is extended until after the briefing contemplated by the Court's April 20 order is submitted, with further direction to be provided by the Court.2. The deadline for each Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until July 1, 2020. The Court intends to adjust this date further once a decision is made with regard to any Motion to Remand.IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DANIEL B. LEVIN re #25 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/21/2020. (emt, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 27 STIPULATION Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Miyagi, Melvyn)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAVID C. FREDERICK re #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/21/2020. (emt, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel B. Levin; Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2361147.Joachim P. Cox appearing for Defendants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC (Cox, Joachim)
April 20, 2020 Filing 24 EO: In the parties' First Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits, Dkt. No. 9, the parties note that "certain questions related to removal jurisdiction are on appeal and currently under submission before the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit." Id. a 4. A cursory review of the Ninth Circuit's docket reveals that at least two cases involving facts substantially similar to the case at hand have been under submission since February 5, 2020, when the Ninth Circuit heard oral argument in both cases. See County of San Mateo, et al. v. Chevron Corp., et al., Nos. 18-15499, 18-15502, 18-15503, and 18-16376 (9th Cir. Mar. 27, 2018); City of Oakland, et al. v. B.P. PLC, et al., No. 18-16663 (9th Cir. Sept. 4, 2018). The issues in those cases appear to be the subject of the forthcoming motions referenced in the parties' stipulation. In light of this, each party in this case is hereby ordered to submit a brief (not to exceed 10 pages in length) by no later than April 30, 2020, in which each party shall: (1) identify all appeals that are relevant to the facts and issues in this case and which are currently pending before any United States Court of Appeals or the United States Supreme Court; (2) state the issues presented in the appeal(s); and (3) address the propriety of a stay of the proceedings in this case pending the resolution of the appeal(s). The parties are encouraged to coordinate and file joint briefs where possible. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
April 20, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #9 First Stipulation and (Proposed) Order to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits, filed by Defendants Chevron Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc., requires court approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum Inc. for Shell Oil Company; Corporate Parent Shell Oil Company for Shell Oil Products Company LLC.. (Cox, Joachim)
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for David C. Frederick Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360757.Joachim P. Cox appearing for Defendants Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC (Cox, Joachim)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joachim P. Cox on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Cox, Joachim)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall C. Whattoff on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC on behalf of Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Whattoff, Randall)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SHAWN PATRICK REGAN re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/20/2020. (emt, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SHANNON S. BROOME re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/20/2020. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marathon Petroleum Corp. re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Shawn Patrick Regan, Esq. of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360355., #10 Notice of Appearance, #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Shannon S. Broome, Esq. of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360349. (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marathon Petroleum Corp. re #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement ; Exhibit "A" (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Petroleum Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation for Marathon Petroleum Corp... (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO VICTOR M. SHER re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/17/2020. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MATTHEW K. EDLING re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/17/2020. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Shawn Patrick Regan, Esq. of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360355.Ted N. Pettit appearing for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp. (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Shannon S. Broome, Esq. of Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360349.Ted N. Pettit appearing for Defendant Marathon Petroleum Corp. (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ted N. Pettit on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp. on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corp.. (Pettit, Ted)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION First Stipulation and Proposed Order to Modify Briefing Schedules and Page Limits by Chevron Corp., Chevron USA Inc.. (Miyagi, Melvyn)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew K. Edling Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360091.Robert M. Kohn appearing for Plaintiff City & County of Honolulu (Kohn, Robert)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Victor M. Sher Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2360083.Robert M. Kohn appearing for Plaintiff City & County of Honolulu (Kohn, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00163 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action with State Court Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Modified on 4/17/2020 (emt, ).
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Chevron Corporation, Chevron U.S.A. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number CIVIL NO. 1CCV-20-0000380 (9th Div). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2359299), filed by Chevron U.S.A. Inc., Chevron Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melvyn M. Miyagi, #2 Exhibit A ( 1CCV-20-0000380 - Complaint; (Request for Jury Trial)), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F - Part 1, #8 Exhibit F - Part 2, #9 Certificate of Service)(Miyagi, Melvyn) Docket text modified on 4/17/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City & County of Honolulu v. Sunoco LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco LP
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corporation
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Lisa A. Bail
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP PLC
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Rex Y. Fujichaku
Represented By: Kevin Allen Morris
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Levin
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Levin
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum LLC
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA Inc.
Represented By: Ross T. Shinyama
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corp.
Represented By: Ross T. Shinyama
Represented By: Melvyn M. Miyagi
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Group Limited
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Rex Y. Fujichaku
Represented By: Kevin Allen Morris
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Daniel B. Levin
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Represented By: David C. Frederick
Represented By: Randall C. Whattoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Matthew B. Allen
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHP Hawaii Inc.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Breon S. Peace
Represented By: Victor L. Hou
Represented By: Rex Y. Fujichaku
Represented By: Kevin Allen Morris
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66 Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: Shannon S. Broome
Represented By: Ted N. Pettit
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp.
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Theodore V. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Represented By: Caitlin Grusauskas
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Represented By: Yahonnes Cleary
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Represented By: John D. Lombardo
Represented By: Lisa A. Bail
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Crystal K. Rose
Represented By: Jameson R. Jones
Represented By: Daniel R. Brody
Represented By: David Alan Morris
Represented By: Sean C. Grimsley
Represented By: Adrian L. Lavarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City & County of Honolulu
Represented By: Nicolette Winter
Represented By: Paul S. Aoki
Represented By: Victor M. Sher
Represented By: Robert M. Kohn
Represented By: Matthew K. Edling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?