Pacific Cold Storage v. Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Cold Storage and 50th State Poultry, Inc.
Defendant: T. Dean Motes and Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00165
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc. (Bonner, Addison)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/18/2020. (jo)
May 18, 2020 Filing 17 DUPLICATE OF #16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 05/18/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 09/04/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. At this conference, telephonic appearances will be allowed by all parties, including decision makers. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 02/12/2021 at 10:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 03/19/2021. (AT&T Service 9:42 - 9:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 05/18/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/06/2021 at 9:45 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 09/04/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. At this conference, telephonic appearances will be allowed by all parties, including decision makers. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 02/12/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/16/2020. Discovery due by 03/19/2021. (AT&T Service 9:42 - 9:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Main Document) (bbb, ).
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 EO: Regarding the #5 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for May 18, 2020:Pursuant to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 50th State Poultry, Inc., Pacific Cold Storage identifying Corporate Parent 50th State Poultry, Inc. for Pacific Cold Storage.. (Okuda, Gary)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiffs Pacific Cold Storage and 50th State Poultry, Inc.'s Scheduling Conference Statement (Okuda, Gary) Docket Text Modified on 5/13/2020 (jo)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by 50th State Poultry, Inc., Pacific Cold Storage.(Okuda, Gary)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by 50th State Poultry, Inc., Pacific Cold Storage. (Okuda, Gary)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.. (Bonner, Addison)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 Defendants' Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Bonner, Addison) Docket Text Modified on 5/11/2020 (jo)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Bonner, Addison)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV200000415. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against 50th State Poultry, Inc., Pacific Cold Storage by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Main Document Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bonner, Addison)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00165 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.. (Bonner, Addison)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.. (Bonner, Addison)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit of the State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-20-0000415. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2359429), filed by T. Dean Motes, Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of T. Dean Motes, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bonner, Addison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Cold Storage v. Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Cold Storage
Represented By: Leighton K. Lee
Represented By: Gary Y. Okuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 50th State Poultry, Inc.
Represented By: Leighton K. Lee
Represented By: Gary Y. Okuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Dean Motes
Represented By: Lyle S. Hosoda
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refrigeration Systems Construction and Service Company, Inc.
Represented By: Lyle S. Hosoda
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?