Corpuz v. United States of America
Plaintiff: RAYNALYN D CORPUZ and Raynalyn D. Corpuz
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00169
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, ; Certificate of Service by United States of America.(Ching, Edric)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 EO: To allow time for Defendant to file an answer, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/15/2020 is CONTINUED to 8/17/2020 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. The Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 EO: To allow time for Defendant to file an answer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/15/2020 is CONTINUED to 8/17/2020 at 09:00AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/15/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Attorney's Office. (emt, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00169 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Leavitt, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by RAYNALYN D CORPUZ. (Leavitt, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America RAYNALYN D CORPUZ ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2359893), filed by RAYNALYN D CORPUZ (Leavitt, James) Docket Text Modified on 4/20/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corpuz v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYNALYN D CORPUZ
Represented By: James T. Leavitt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raynalyn D. Corpuz
Represented By: Rafael Kiichiro Renteria
Represented By: James T. Leavitt, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole P Kalakau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?