Milare v. U.S. Dept. of HHS
Plaintiff: Jared Milare
Defendant: NIH, SAMHSA, CDC, FDA and U.S. Dept. of HHS
Case Number: 1:2020cv00195
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 EO: Court continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 09:00 a.m. on 07/29/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on June 1, 2020, this conference/hearing before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby."5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jp, ).
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 EO: In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on June 1, 2020, the Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 06/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby."5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/29/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Jared Milare served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 30, 2020. A file-stamped copy of the Complaint and IFP Application were included in the mailing to Mr. Milare.
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Jared Milare. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Jared Milare. (emt, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against All Defendants - filed by Jared Milare. (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milare v. U.S. Dept. of HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMHSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of HHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Milare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?