Lerette v. City and County of Hawaii
Plaintiff: Tristan T Burton and Erin Lerette
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10, Paul T. Isotani, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Luke Watkins, City and County of Hawaii, Landon Takenishi, Hawaii County Police Department and Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00202
Filed: May 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 EO: Court continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set 06/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 07/29/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on June 1, 2020, this conference/hearing before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference/hearing. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby."5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Luke Watkins, Paul T. Isotani, and Landon Takenishi's Motion To Dismiss filed by Hawaii County Police Department, City and County of Hawaii, Paul T. Isotani, Luke Watkins, Landon Takenishi by City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, Luke Watkins Supplemental Declaration RE: Defendants County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Luke Watkins, Paul T. Isotani, and Landon Takenishi's Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Luke Watkings, Paul Isotani, and Landon Takenishi's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement PLAINTIFFS ERIN LERETTE, individually and as guardian and next friend of minor child, B.T.B.; and TRISTAN T. BURTONS RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Revere, Terrance)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 Errata to Declaration of Counsel [Doc 16]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Luke Watkins, Paul T. Isotani, and Landon Takenishi's Motion To Dismiss Devin K. Horowitz appearing for Defendants Luke Watkins, City and County of Hawaii, Paul T. Isotani, Hawaii County Police Department, Landon Takenishi (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration Jon Henricks, #3 Declaration D. Kaena Horowitz, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Certificate of Service)(Horowitz, Devin)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Laureen L. Martin on behalf of City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, Luke Watkins (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Martin, Laureen)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 Return of Service on Subpoena Hilo Medical Center was served on 06-01-20 (Horowitz, Devin)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erin Lerette. All Defendants. (Breiner, Myles)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, Luke Watkins re #11 Notice of Appearance, (Horowitz, Devin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Devin K. Horowitz on behalf of City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, Luke Watkins (Horowitz, Devin)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, Luke Watkins City and County of Hawaii, Hawaii County Police Department, Paul T. Isotani, Landon Takenishi, and Luke Watkins' Notice of Production of Documents in Lieu of Taking Deposition (Horowitz, Devin)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
May 4, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-No Signature-Please be advised that Document #8 Consent Election Form, is not signed. The filing party may refer to Section 7.1 CM/ECF User's Signature, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear. (e.g. /s/John or Jane Lawyer)" The filing party shall resubmit their filing. (jo)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00 AM on 6/29/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00202 RT on all further pleadings. (jni)
May 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Erin Lerette. (Revere, Terrance)
May 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City and County of Hawaii All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2366412.), filed by Erin Lerette (Attachments: #1 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, #2 SUMMONS)(Revere, Terrance) Docket Text Modified on 5/4/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerette v. City and County of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan T Burton
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Represented By: Paul V. Smith
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Lerette
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Represented By: Paul V. Smith
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul T. Isotani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon Takenishi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?