Nalu Kai Incorporated v. CORE Kiteboarding GmbH
Plaintiff: Nalu Kai Incorporated
Defendant: CORE Kiteboarding GmbH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00211
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 EO: Counsel Colin Miwa informs the Court that he is working with the Defendant on a possible settlement and that the Defendant is in the process of retaining counsel. Therefore, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/06/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 08/19/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 08/12/2020. Below is the call-in information. Mr. Miwa to notify the parties. Although the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's April 16, 2020 and June 1, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency indicates that "civil hearings, including settlement conferences, scheduled before June 15, 2020 will either be conducted telephonically", due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 15, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint, #9 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark has been served by First Class Mail to Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nalu Kai Incorporated AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Miwa, Colin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. Please submit the the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 120 Report to the Director. (emt, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to CORE Kiteboarding GmbH. (emt, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00211 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Miwa, Colin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miwa, Colin)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CORE Kiteboarding GmbH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2368102.), filed by Nalu Kai Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miwa, Colin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nalu Kai Incorporated v. CORE Kiteboarding GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nalu Kai Incorporated
Represented By: Colin O. Miwa
Represented By: Martin E. Hsia
Represented By: Nathaniel Dang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORE Kiteboarding GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?