State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Davis
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Puakailima Davis, Wendell Davis and Kaehukaiopalemano Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00213
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 EO: Plaintiff's counsel advises the Court that the Defendants have requested and extension to July 10 to answer the Complaint, therefore the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/06/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 07/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/17/2020. Counsel Ashley R. Shibuya to notify the parties.Although the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's June 1, 2020 and April 16, 2020 Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency indicates that "civil hearings, including settlement conferences, scheduled before June 15, 2020 will either be conducted telephonically", due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Kaehukaiopalemano Davis served on 5/16/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Wendell Davis served on 5/18/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Puakailima Davis served on 5/18/2020. (Shibuya, Ashley)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/6/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00213 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, an Illinois corporation. (Shibuya, Ashley)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Shibuya, Ashley)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 Receipt Number 0975-2368434.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, an Illinois corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shibuya, Ashley) Modified on 5/7/2020 (mta1, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: David R. Harada-Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puakailima Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendell Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaehukaiopalemano Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?