Young v. University of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Robert Neale Young
Defendant: American Bar Association Legal Education Section, National Conference of Bar Examiners, Breaking Media Inc., State Bar of Michigan, Michigan Board of Law Examiners, American Bar Association, Thomson Reuters, Inc., Association of American Law Schools and University of Hawai'i
Case Number: 1:2020cv00231
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of 15 Notice of Case Assignment, 16 Notice to Parties, and #17 Order Setting Status Conference has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record for Stephen Robert Neale Young and Erik A. Grill. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (jo)
May 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO PARTIES: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record for Case Number 2:20-cv-11036, Stephen Robert Neale Young v. University of Hawaii, et al., transferred from the District of Michigan Eastern. Please be advised that Chief U.S. District Judge J. Michael Seabright and U.S. Magistrate Judge Rom A. Trader have been assigned to this case. Please reflect Civil Case Number: CV 20-00231 JMS-RT on all further filings. Submission of Pro Hac Vice Applications: The parties may refer to LR83.1 of the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii with respect to the submission of applications for pro hac vice admittance and the designation of local counsel (a member in good standing of the bar of this court who maintains an office within this district). The "Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Declaration of Counsel Package" (form HID007-007a) is available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov (see "Forms" section, under the subsection, "Miscellaneous"). The filing fee is $300 per attorney, per case. The Local Rules for the District of Hawaii and information concerning CM/ECF registration are available at www.hid.uscourts.gov. (jo)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00231 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-11036. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 16, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs on Appeal by Stephen Young. (Young, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 NOTICE of Error as to Stephen Young [E-filer]. Other Please refile Application in a non-fillable format. Document has been stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 Certificate of Service re 10 Notice of Appeal. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 [STRICKEN] APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs on Appeal by Stephen Young. (Young, Stephen) Modified on 5/15/2020 (SSch). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Stephen Young re 9 Order Transferring Case Outside the State of Michigan. Fee Status: Filing fee not paid. (Young, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Hawaii. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Terrence G. Berg and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen to District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik A. Grill on behalf of Michigan Board of Law Examiners. (Grill, Erik) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker to District Judge Terrence G. Berg. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing Fee for Civil Case Received by Stephen Young. Receipt No: CMIEDC-7767619 - Fee: 400 re 4 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid, Pro Se Efiling Account Created, 2 Docket Annotation, 3 Pro Se Application for E-filing, 1 Complaint. (Young, Stephen) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Fee Not Paid. Correction due by 5/5/2020 (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Pro Se E-filing Account Created for Stephen Young. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Pro Se Application for E-filing submitted by Stephen Young. Filing Fee Not Currently Paid. Link will be sent for payment. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Plaintiff's statement re payment of fees via credit card. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephen Young against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 JS 44 Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment 1, # 3 Attachment 2, # 4 Attachment 3, # 5 Attachment 4) (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 5/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. University of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bar Association Legal Education Section
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Conference of Bar Examiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breaking Media Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Board of Law Examiners
Represented By: Erik A. Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Association of American Law Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Hawai'i
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Robert Neale Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?