Eliason et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Joyce S. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015, Max D. Eliason, Kylie Marie Eliason, Brett L. Eliason, Veronique P. Eliason, Max D. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015 and Brittnie Lynne Eliason
Defendant: Stephens Management Company, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Kirton McConkie, P.C., Bryan P. Stephens, Lisa Stephens, Craig McCullough and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2020cv00257
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 EO: Although the Court dismissed this action and judgment entered, Plaintiffs continue to submit exhibits. The Court will no longer file documents bearing no relationship to this case and/or that do not present legitimate requests for relief. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 EXHIBIT "E" - filed by Brett L. Eliason. (emt, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 17 EXHIBIT "D" - filed by Brett L. Eliason. (emt, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE and OBJECTION to the Dismissal Without Prejudice of This Matter and a Motion to Compel Chief Judge Michael Seabright and Judge Jill Otake to Uphold the Constitutional Rights of the Victims Who Have Filed for Relief Under the General Assembly Resolution 40/34 and Under the Civil Provisions of the RICO Act of 1970 and to Uphold the Oath They Each Took When Accepting Office on Behalf of the Citizens Who Fall Under Their Jurisdiction and Venue Such is the Case Herein re #14 - filed by Brett L. Eliason. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Petition for Writ of Mandamus captioned for filing in the Utah Supreme Court) (emt, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 7/13/2020 pursuant to ECF NO. #14 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Brett L. Eliason shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 14, 2020.
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/13/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Brett L. Eliason shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on July 14, 2020.
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 EXHIBIT "A" for Case No. #:20-cv-00257-JAO-WRP - filed by Brett L. Eliason. (emt, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 Letter addressed to Honorable Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright and Honorable Judge Jill Otake from Brett L. Eliason, dated July 4, 2020. (emt, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Brett L. Eliason submitted re #10 MOTION for the Clerk to Execute a Claim for Unconstitutionality Form. (The filing party submitted only the signature page.) (emt, )
July 6, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #10 Second Motion to Clerk and Advisory Entry-No Signature served by First Class Mail to Brett L. Eliason at the address of record on July 6, 2020. (emt, )
July 6, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Signature-Please be advised that Document #10 MOTION for the Clerk to Execute a Claim for Unconstitutionality Form filed by Brett L. Eliason is not signed. The filer is directed to sign the enclosed copy of the document and return it to the Clerk's Office. The filing party is reminded that all documents submitted for filing must contain a wet signature. (emt, )
July 3, 2020 Filing 10 Response and Objection to the Defendants Motion to Have the Matter Dismissed and Their Associated Challenge of Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue; Second MOTION for the Clerk of the United States District Court of Hawaii to Execute a Claim for Unconstitutionality Form as Per 28 U.S. Code 2403; Which Requires The Intervention by the United States or the State of Hawaii Due to a Constitutional Question and Appoint the United States Attorney General to Pursue this Matter on a Criminal Basis ; Motion for Default Summary Judgement Against the Corporation of the President of the Church of Latter-Day Saints and the Law Offices of Kirton McConkie PC - by Plaintiff Brett L. Eliason. This document is not signed. (emt, )
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED OR TRANSFERRED FOR IMPROPER VENUE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 6/16/2020. Accordingly, by July 16, 2020, Plaintiffs are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed or transferred for improper venue. Alternatively, if Plaintiffs no longer wish to pursue this action in Hawai'i, they may submit a notice of dismissal in conformance with Local Rule 41.1 voluntarily dismissing this action without prejudice by July 16, 2020. Plaintiffs are cautioned that failure to establish that venue is proper or to comply with this Order to Show Cause in any respect will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. Show Cause Response due by 7/16/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Brett Eliason shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 17, 2020.
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for the Clerk of the Court and/or Honorable Judge Otake to Execute Attached Notification of Claim of Unconstitutionality as Per 28 U.S. Code 2403 Intervention by the United States or a State Due to a Constitutional Question - by Plaintiff Brett L. Eliason. Note: This document contains an electronic signature. (emt, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 EO: Plaintiff Brett Eliason sent the Court an email on 6/13/20, requesting "immediate relief before the injunction hearing" and asking the Court to review the attached letter and document titled "Motion for the Clerk of Court and/or Honorable Judge Otake to Execute the Attached Notification of Claim of Unconstitutionality as Per 28 U.S. Code 2403 Intervention by the United States or a State Due to a Constitutional Question." Because pro se litigants are prohibited from communicating "with the presiding judge or chambers staff by letter, telephone, or electronic means," Local Rule 81.1(f), Plaintiff shall cease communicating with the Court or chambers staff. Moreover, because "[r]equests for action must be brought by motion subject to response by the opposing party," see id., the Court will not entertain or take action on the motion or letter attached to the email. Plaintiff is responsible for submitting documents for filing; the Court will not file documents on his behalf. Plaintiff is cautioned that any documents he sends directly to the Court will be shared with all parties. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Email to Judge Jill A. Otake from Plaintiff Brett Eliason, dated June 13, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Execute Notification of Claim of Unconstitutionality, #2 Letter to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright and Judge Jill A. Otake, dated June 9, 2020) (emt, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (NEF)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/3/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Brett L. Eliason served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on June 5, 2020. A file-stamped copy of the Complaint, receipt and blank summons form was returned by First Class Mail to Mr. Eliason at the address of record on June 5, 2020. Modified on 6/5/2020 (emt, ).
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI028791 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Brett L. Eliason. (emt, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and REQUEST for Injunction Under the Civil Provisions of the RICO Act of 1970 and Under the Victims' Right of General Assembly 40/34 Regarding Abuse of Power against All Defendants, filed by Brett L. Eliason, Max D. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015, Max D. Eliason, Joyce S. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015, Kylie Marie Eliason, Brittnie Lynne Eliason, Veronique P. Eliason. (ECF No. #3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI028791 re #1 Complaint). (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide the Information Required by Law (as per the attached proposed orders), Adjoinder of Case No. 1:20-cv-0024-RJS-DBP (Eliason et al v. The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, et al., 1:20-CV-959-PAB (District of Colorado), #2Victims' Response and Objection to Defendants Ongoing Motions to be Dismissed from a Complaint that was Made Under the Civil Provisions of the RICO Act of 1970... (captioned for the United States Supreme Court and District Courts, references case numbers: 1:20-cv-00024-RJS-DBP (Utah), 1:20-cv-00959-PAB-SKC (Colorado) ) (Part 1 of 2), #3 Response and Objection to Defendants Motions (Part 2 of 2), #4 Exhibit A re Response and Objection, #5 Exhibit B re Response and Objection, #6 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ) Modified on 6/5/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliason et al v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce S. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max D. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kylie Marie Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett L. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronique P. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max D. Eliason Estate and Trust Dated October 28, 2015
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittnie Lynne Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirton McConkie, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?