Laraya v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rodrigo M. Laraya
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00259
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a certified copy of #6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS has been served by First Class Mail to Diane C. Haar, Esq. at the address of record on July 10, 2020. The service documents identified in the Clerk's Letter were included in the mailing to Ms. Haar. A copy of the Order was provided to the U.S. Marshals Service via email. (emt, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 Letter to Diane C. Haar, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff Rodrigo M. Laraya re ECF No. #6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS, dated July 10, 2020. (emt, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney's Office and U.S. Attorney General of the United States. (emt, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS re #3 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/10/2020. (emt, )
June 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00259 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Diane C. Haar appearing for Plaintiff Rodrigo M. Laraya (Haar, Diane)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Haar, Diane)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Review of Social Security Disability Insurance Determination against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Rodrigo M. Laraya. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haar, Diane) Docket text modified on 6/6/2020 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laraya v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo M. Laraya
Represented By: Diane C. Haar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?