The Revere Group Inc. v. Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: The Revere Group Inc. and Revere Group Inc., The
Defendant: Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd., Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. individually and doing business as Hawaiian Isles Water Company, a Hawaii corporation doing business as Hawaiian Isles Water Company, Doe Entities 1-50, Doe Corporations 1-50, Doe Partnerships 1-50, Jane Does 1-50 and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2020cv00267
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/4/2020. (emt, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/4/2020. (emt, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 EP: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/4/2020. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. The Court discussed with the parties consenting to a Magistrate Judge and scheduling an early settlement conference. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/9/2021 in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 5/14/2021 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/10/2021. Discovery due by 6/14/2021. (Court Reporter AT&T 9:05 a.m. - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(laa)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Enver W. Painter, Jr on behalf of Revere Group Inc., The on behalf of Revere Group Inc., The. (Painter, Enver)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.'s Scheduling Conference Statement . (Klein, Kurt) Modified on 7/30/2020 (emt, ).
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant The Revere Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Piper, Alika)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, - Title of pleading: Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant The Revere Group, Inc.'s Answer to Counterclaim Filed on July 7, 2020 by Revere Group Inc., The. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Piper, Alika)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint). (Klein, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Klein on behalf of Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. on behalf of Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.. (Klein, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew Robyak on behalf of Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. on behalf of Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.. (Robyak, David)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent HIE Holdings, Inc. for Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd... (Klein, Kurt)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Royal Hawaiian Water Co., LTD.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Revere Group Inc., The by Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd..(Klein, Kurt) Modified on 7/9/2020 (emt, ).
June 18, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Revere Group Inc., The re #3 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #6 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, [Summons returned executed as to Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. Royal Hawaiian Water Co. Ltd. served on 6/10/2020 through Michael Boulware, registered agent] (Piper, Alika) Docket text modified on 6/23/2020 (emt, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Revere Group Inc., The. (Piper, Alika)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. (emt, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Piper, Alika)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/4/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00267 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2380727.), filed by The Revere Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Piper, Alika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Revere Group Inc. v. Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Hawaiian Water Co., Ltd. individually and doing business as Hawaiian Isles Water Company, a Hawaii corporation doing business as Hawaiian Isles Water Company
Represented By: Robert G. Klein
Represented By: Kurt W. Klein
Represented By: David Andrew Robyak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Revere Group Inc.
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revere Group Inc., The
Represented By: Alika L. Piper
Represented By: Enver W. Painter, Jr.
Represented By: Simon Klevansky
Represented By: Elaine T. Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?