Ingall v. Rabago, et al.
Plaintiff: Samuel B Ingall
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-5, Doe Entities 1-5, Doe Officer 1, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Honolulu Police Department, Doe LLC's 1-5, John Rabago, Chief of Police Susan M. Ballard, City and County of Honolulu, Doe Officer 2, Reginald Ramones and Doe Partnerships 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv00306
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Atwell, Stephen)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samuel B Ingall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Service)(Kobashigawa, Clarisse)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 EO: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2020 is CONTINUED to 10/27/2020 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JOHN RABAGO TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/10/2020.IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, by and between Rabago and counsel for Plaintiff, without objection by or from counsel for the City, that Rabago shall have until Tuesday, September 8, 2020, in which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint.(jni)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .The Motion Hearing is scheduled for Tuesday, September 22, 2020 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE ALAN C. KAY. Pursuant to the CARES Act, the Court will be using AT&T Connect Audio Conference for this Motion Hearing before Judge Kay. For anyone who wishes to participate in this hearing, please follow the participant instructions below:Counsel and applicable Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes before the scheduled start time of the hearing so that the Courtroom Manager can take attendance.PARTICIPANT INSTRUCTIONS: 1. Dial 1-888-684-8852 2. Enter your Access Code (9657219) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign. 3. Message will say "To join the conference as the host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#)." 4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby. 5. When the Host joins, you will then be connected to the Conference.SO ORDERED by (JUDGE ALAN C. KAY)(il, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Atwell, Stephen)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stephen Deutsch Atwell appearing for Defendant City and County of Honolulu (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Tammy Chee, #3 Certificate of Service)(Atwell, Stephen)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, ICCV200000131 (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 8/17/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00306 ACK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City and County of Honolulu from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-20-0000131. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2397089), filed by City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(Atwell, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingall v. Rabago, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Officer 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe LLC's 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rabago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Susan M. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Stephen Deutsch Atwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Officer 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald Ramones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel B Ingall
Represented By: Myles S. Breiner
Represented By: Terrance M. Revere
Represented By: Clarisse M. Kobashigawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?