Freitas v. Derr et al
Petitioner: Mr. John Ferdinand Freitas
Respondent: Ms. Estella Derr, Mr. Kyle Olsen and Ms. Annelizabeth Card
Case Number: 1:2020cv00312
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Letter from Petitioner John Ferdinand Freitas, dated July 26, 2020 Re : ECF No. #5 Filing Fee. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI029092 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (emt, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2020: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, ).
July 20, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and #4 Clerk's Judgment shall be served by First Class Mail to John Ferdinand Freitas at the address of record on July 21, 2020. (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 7/20/2020 pursuant to ECF No. #3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (emt, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 7/20/2020. The Petition is DISMISSED without leave to amend for lack of jurisdiction. Any request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED, as Freitas has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. See 28 U.S.C. 2253(c)(2). The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment and close the file. (emt, )
July 15, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #2 Habeas Deficiency Order and a filed stamped copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus shall be served by First Class Mail to John Ferdinand Freitas at the address of record on July 16, 2020. A copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Freitas. (emt, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/15/2020. (emt, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by John Ferdinand Freitas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas v. Derr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Estella Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Kyle Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Annelizabeth Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mr. John Ferdinand Freitas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?