Johnson et al v. Safeway Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Johnson and Melissa L Johnson
Defendant: Doe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Safeway Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00328
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Service Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Yamane, John) Docket Text Modified on 9/14/2020 (jo)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/24/2020. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties to this matter are ORDERED TO APPEAR for a confidential settlement conference, on May 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (jo)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/24/2020. (jo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 EP: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2020. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued. The Court discussed with the parties consenting to a Magistrate Judge and scheduling an early settlement conference. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/24/2021 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/12/2021 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference by VTC is set for 5/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. The Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Settlement Conference statements by 5/19/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/24/2021. Discovery due by 6/25/2021. (ATT / 9:00 a.m. - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safeway Inc. (Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs) (Lezy, Normand)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiffs. (Yamane, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement by Safeway Inc. (Lezy, Normand)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 09:30AM is ADVANCED to 09:00AM, the same day, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(F) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service. (Yamane, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, State of Hawaii, 2CCV-20-0000169. (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Complaint; Summons, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Payment Due to Court, #5 Receipt, #6 Defendant Safeway Inc.'s Answer to Complaint Filed June 24, 2020; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service, #7 Payment Due to Court, #8 Receipt, #9 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit "A"; Certificate of Service, #10 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 at 09:00AM is CONTINUED to 09:30AM, the same day, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeway Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, LLC for Safeway Inc... (Lezy, Normand)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 8/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00328 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway Inc. from Second Circuit Court, case number 2CCV-20-0000169. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2401523), filed by Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Shawn L.M. Benton
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Johnson
Represented By: John D. Yamane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa L Johnson
Represented By: John D. Yamane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?