Henderson v. Safeway Inc.
Plaintiff: Naomi Henderson
Defendant: John Doe Partnerships 1-10, John Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Safeway Inc., John and Jane Does 1-10 and John Doe Corporations 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00329
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naomi Henderson (Kusachi, Naomi)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naomi Henderson (Kusachi, Naomi)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 9/2/2020. (emt, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 EO: Non-Jury Trial previously set for 08/30/2021 WILL BE MOVED TO 08/31/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 EP: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/24/2020. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 8/30/2021 in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/20/2021 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 6/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/31/2021. Discovery due by 7/2/2021. (AT&T 9:30 am - 9:35 am) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(tyk) Modified on 8/24/2020 (tyk).
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020, at 9:30 a.m., before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Parties are to participate via telephone through the court's AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(tl, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Safeway Inc. (Request for Answers to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Lezy, Normand)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 Scheduling Conference Statement by Safeway Inc. (Lezy, Normand)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff Naomi Henderson's Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Kusachi, Naomi) Modified on 8/17/2020 (emt, ).
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Planning Meeting ; Certificate of Service. (Kusachi, Naomi)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Naomi Henderson and Defendant Safeway Inc. Please continue to reflect case number CV 20-00329 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Consent Election Form
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 Consent Election Form
July 30, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeway Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, LLC for Safeway Inc... (Lezy, Normand)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00329 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway Inc. from Second Circuit Court, case number 2CCV-20-0000080. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2401583), filed by Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Safeway Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Inc.
Represented By: Shawn L.M. Benton
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Henderson
Represented By: Jan K. Apo
Represented By: Mark D. Reck
Represented By: Naomi Miyoko Kusachi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?