Johnson v. Kawamura Law Office, LLLC et al
Plaintiff: Mark A. Johnson
Defendant: Robert D. Kawamura, Kawamura Law Office, LLLC, Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00358
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2020 is CONTINUED to 12/1/2020 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00358 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Consent Election Form
August 25, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #10 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright have been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 on August 25, 2020. (jo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Mark A. Johnson (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Mark A. Johnson. (Anderson, Dane)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert D. Kawamura, Kawamura Law Office, LLLC. (jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 10/19/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00358 WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Mark A. Johnson. (Street, J.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2412671.), filed by Mark A. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Kawamura Law Office, LLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Kawamura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawamura Law Office, LLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Johnson
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Represented By: Dane Kristofer Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?