Gilliam v. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP
Plaintiff: William H. Gilliam
Defendant: Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00372
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 EO: Mr. Miyashiro informs the Court of the #7 Executed Waiver of Service which allows the parties to answer by 11/13/2020, therefore request a continuance to also allow parties to meet. Request is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/26/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 12/08/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Scheduling conference statements are due by 12/01/2020. Mr. Miyashiro to notify the parties.In accordance to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP waiver sent on 9/14/2020, answer due 11/13/2020. (Miyashiro, Duane)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Christine S. Madriaga on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Madriaga, Jamie Christine)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Miyashiro on behalf of Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Miyashiro, Duane)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $400.00; receipt number HI029247 re #1 Complaint (jo)
August 28, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - filed copies of ECF Nos. #1 , #2 , and #3 have been emailed to Plaintiff William H. Gilliam on August 28, 2020. (jo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 10/26/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (jo)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/28/2020. (jo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP - filed by William H. Gilliam (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter McGuire Kiakona & Chow, LLP
Represented By: Jamie Christine S. Madriaga
Represented By: Duane R. Miyashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?