Iraj Kangavari et al v. Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel et al
Plaintiff: Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari and Iraj Kangavari
Defendant: Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel and DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 1:2020cv00379
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00379 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05513. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR DISTRICT OF HAWAII by Judge Stephen V. Wilson transferring case to District of Hawaii. Case transferred electronically on 8/31/2020. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 First STIPULATION to Change Venue to District Court of Hawaii filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Transfer of Venue)(Custurea, Andreea) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR FURTHER EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson reStipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #20 . Defendant has up to, and including, August 28, 2020 to respond to the Complaint. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Custurea, Andreea) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING NOTICE IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: Order to Show Cause #10 - The OSC is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete document; missing second page In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Allison Brooke Etkin counsel for Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. Sheila E. Fix is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Etkin, Allison) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Motion Related Document, #14 . The joint motion is GRANTED. Defendant has up to, and including, August 21, 2020 to respond to the Complaint. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Allison Brooke Etkin counsel for Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. Changing address to 10960 Wilshire Boulevard, 18th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90024-3804. Changing Email: aetkin@wshblaw.com to Fax: (310) 481-7650. Filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Etkin, Allison) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re First REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel #11 filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Attachments: #1 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT)(Attorney Allison Brooke Etkin added to party Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel(pty:dft))(Etkin, Allison) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re First REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel #11 filed by Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT)(Attorney Sheila E Fix added to party Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel(pty:dft))(Fix, Sheila) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 First REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel filed by Plaintiff Iraj Kangavari, Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari. Request set for hearing on 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ani Shagvaladyan, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2020.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Iraj Kangavari, Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari, upon Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel served on 6/24/2020, answer due 7/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jo Byrne, Service Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05513 SVW(KKx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant All Plaintiffs, identifying Iraj Kangavari and Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari. (Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Iraj Kangavari, Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari. (Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Iraj Kangavari, Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari. (Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26904481 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Iraj Kangavari, Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari. (Attorney Ani Shagvaladyan added to party Iraj Kangavari(pty:pla), Attorney Ani Shagvaladyan added to party Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari (pty:pla))(Shagvaladyan, Ani) [Transferred from California Central on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iraj Kangavari et al v. Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Waikiki Beach Hotel
Represented By: Andreea Virginia Custurea
Represented By: Sheila E Fix
Represented By: Allison Brooke Etkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahnaz Davoody Kangavari
Represented By: Payam Paul Aghabala
Represented By: Ani Shagvaladyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iraj Kangavari
Represented By: Payam Paul Aghabala
Represented By: Ani Shagvaladyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?