McCoy v. Sequeira et al
Petitioner: Isaiah McCoy
Respondent: David Van Acker, Todd W. Eddins, State of Hawaii and Francis Sequeira
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2020cv00384
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Docket No. 10 has been served by First Class Mail to Isaiah McCoy at the address of record on October 26, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 EO: On 9/18/20, the Court issued an order dismissing the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus without prejudice as unexhausted and pursuant to the Younger abstention doctrine [ECF 4]. In the same order, the Court denied any request for a certificate of appealability and instructed the Clerk of Court to close the file and terminate the action. Judgment was entered the same day [ECF 5]. McCoy subsequently filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF 6], that the Court denied as moot because the action had been terminated [ECF 8]. McCoy now files a letter claiming that he has exhausted his administrative and judicial remedies [ECF 9]. Because the Court dismissed the Petition and denied the IFP Application, there is nothing before the Court to consider. If McCoy wishes to file a new habeas petition and/or IFP application, he may do so. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter addressed to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright from Isaiah McCoy re: Notice of exhaustion of state administrative and judicial remedies related to issues raised in the petition, dated October 7, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )
October 14, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis has been served by First Class Mail to Isaiah McCoy at the address of record on October 14, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 EO: On 9/18/20, the Court dismissed without prejudice as unexhausted McCoy's petition for a writ of habeas corpus [ECF 4], and the Clerk entered judgment the same day [ECF 5]. On 10/5/20, the Court received McCoy's application to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF 6]. Because the Court dismissed McCoy's petition and this action has been terminated, McCoy's IFP application is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
October 5, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF Nos. #4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and #5 Clerk's Judgment shall be resent to Isaiah McCoy at Halawa Correctional Facility by First Class Mail on October 6, 2020 (see Notice of Change of Address, ECF No. #7 , filed on October 5, 2020). Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter Re: Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and NOTICE of Change of Address - by Isaiah McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Petitioner Isaiah McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 18, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF No. #4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and ECF No. #5 Clerk's Judgment shall be served by First Class Mail to Isaiah McCoy at the address of record on September 21, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 9/18/2020 pursuant to ECF No. #4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (emt, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re #1 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/18/2020. (1) The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice as unexhausted and pursuant to the Younger abstention doctrine. (2) Any pending motions are DENIED. (3) Any request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. (4) The Clerk of Court SHALL close the file and terminate this action. (emt, )
September 10, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #3 ORDER OF RECUSAL has been served by First Class Mail to Isaiah McCoy at the address of record on September 10, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/10/2020. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. Please reflect new case number CV 20-00384 DKW-RT on all further filings . (emt, )
September 9, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF No. #2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Isaiah McCoy at the address of record on September 9, 2020. A blank Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, its instructions and a file-stamped copy of the initiating document were included in the mailing to Mr. McCoy. (emt, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/9/2020. (emt, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2241(c)(3), 28 U.S.C. 2243 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Isaiah McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Sequeira et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Van Acker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd W. Eddins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francis Sequeira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Isaiah McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?