Shin v. USA
Petitioner: Patrick Shin
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00390
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 EO: The Government's motion for an extension is granted. The Government's new deadline for responding to the coram nobis petition is November 25, 2020. Mr. Shin may file an optional reply memorandum by December 9, 2020. re #5 . (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(cib)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time In Which to Respond to Second Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis Sara D. Ayabe appearing for Respondent USA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara D. Ayabe, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ayabe, Sara)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara D. Ayabe on behalf of USA on behalf of USA. (Ayabe, Sara)
September 12, 2020 Filing 3 EO: The Government's response to the coram nobis petition is due by October 26, 2020. Mr. Shin's optional reply memorandum should be filed by November 9, 2020. (JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY)(tl)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00390 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. All docket entries relative to the Coram Nobis Motion will be entered in both cases: CR 04-00150 SOM-1 and CV 20-00390 SOM-KJM. Please reflect the two case numbers on all further filings. (jo)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Defendants Second Coram Nobis MOTION - Thomas M. Otake appearing for Petitioner Patrick Shin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shin v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Michael David Nammar
Represented By: Sara D. Ayabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Shin
Represented By: Thomas M. Otake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?