Earn Ocean Limited v. Koon
Plaintiff: Earn Ocean Limited
Defendant: John Koon, Does 1-10 and Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00404
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/23/2020. (emt, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 23 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held.Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Non-Jury Trial is set for 11/22/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/12/2021 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 08/18/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 06/23/2021. Discovery due by 09/24/2021. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaiis latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, due to the uncertainty of the ongoing pandemic and to minimize traffic into the Courthouse, at this time, hard copies of any settlement conference statements need not be delivered to the Clerk's Office. Instead, parties are to submit their confidential settlement statements via email to mansfield_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.The Court will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:33 - 9:37) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 EO: #4 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2020 will be held via telephone. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARK E. TEPPER re #20 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/20/2020. (emt, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark E. Tepper Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2450783.Normand R. Lezy appearing for Defendants John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc. (Lezy, Normand)
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Nakano on behalf of John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc. on behalf of John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc.. (Nakano, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement by Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc. and John Koon. (Lezy, Normand)
November 20, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc..(Lezy, Normand)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff Earn Ocean Limited's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ferry, John) Modified on 11/17/2020 (emt, ).
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ferry, John) Modified on 11/17/2020 (emt, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 First Amended Summons Issued as to John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc. (emt, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 EO: Upon review of Plaintiff's #9 Amended Complaint filed on October 2, 2020, the Court takes no further action on its September 28, 2020 #8 Order to Show Cause. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Earn Ocean Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Ferry, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Ferry, John)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Earn Ocean Limited.(Ferry, John) Modified on 10/6/2020 (emt, ).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 9/28/2020. Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2020. (emt, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Koon, Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc. (jni)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30 AM on 11/23/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00404 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Ferry, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2427389.), filed by Earn Ocean Limited. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferry, John) Docket Text Modified on 9/25/2020 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earn Ocean Limited v. Koon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koon
Represented By: Mark E. Tepper
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradewinds Marine Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Tepper
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earn Ocean Limited
Represented By: John Dickinson Ferry, III
Represented By: A. Bernard Bays
Represented By: Christian D. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?