Kaneaiakala v. Frink
Petitioner: Bronson Kaneaiakala
Respondent: Martin Frink
Interested Party: Laurie Nadamoto and Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2020cv00409
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EO: Before the court is Respondents Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Amended Petition [ECF #8 ]. The motion is GRANTED. Respondent may file an answer or dispositive motion in response to the Amended Petition on or before January 21, 2021. Petitioner may file a reply to Respondents answer no later than March 8, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on November 19, 2020. (bbb)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer to the Amended Petition; Declaration of Loren J. Thomas; Certificate of Service Loren J. Thomas appearing for Respondent Martin Frink (Thomas, Loren)
November 5, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ANSWER AMENDED PETITION has been served by First Class Mail to Bronson Kaneaiakala at the address of record on November 5, 2020. The #7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ANSWER AMENDED PETITION and #5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus was served by email to the Department of the Attorney General at atg.habeascorpuspetitions@hawaii.gov and by First Class Mail to the Department of the Attorney General, 425 Queen Street, Honolulu, HI 96813. Note: Service to the Prosecuting Attorney, City and County of Honolulu is made through the Department of the Attorney General, State of Hawaii. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ANSWER AMENDED PETITION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 11/5/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts, that Respondent file an answer or dispositive motion in response to the Amended Petition on or before December 21, 2020 . Kaneaiakala may file a Reply to Respondent's Answer no later than February 5, 2021 . Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2020. (emt, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 (AMENDED) PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody - filed by Bronson Kaneaiakala. (Attachments: #1 Verification of after-hours time stamp)(emt, )
October 2, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND shall be served by First Class Mail to Bronson Kaneaiakala at the address of record on October 5, 2020. A blank Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody form shall be included in the mailing to Mr. Kaneaiakala. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/2/2020. (1) The Petition is DISMISSED with leave granted to amend on or before November 2, 2020. Failure to timely file an amended petition that cures the deficiency noted above may result in dismissal of this action without further notice. (2) The Clerk shall SEND Kaneaiakala a blank Petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody so that he can comply with the instructions in this Order. (emt, )
September 29, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of ECF No. 3 has been served by First Class Mail to Plaintiff Bronson Kaneaiakala, Register No. A1052859, SAGUARO CORRECTIONAL CENTER, 1250 EAST ARICA RD, ELOY, AZ 85131 on 09/29/2020. (shm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number HI029372 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (emt, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody - filed by Bronson Kaneaiakala. (Attachments: #1 Verification of after-hours time stamp) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaneaiakala v. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bronson Kaneaiakala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Frink
Represented By: Loren J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?