Pitts v. Summerville et al
Petitioner: Joseph Pitts
Respondent: Laurie Nadamoto, Honorable Judge Summerville and DPS Former Dir. Nolan Espinda
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington
Case Number: 1:2020cv00421
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 9 Entering Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on 11/30/2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (bbb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EO: Before the court is Petitioner's Request to Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield to Order Court Clerk to Stamp "Open in Plaintiffs Presence" on Court Mailings Sent to Petitioner [ECF No. #8 ]. The court issued an order dismissing this petition and denying any certificate of appealability on October 28, 2020 [ECF No. #6 ]. The Clerk of Court entered judgment the same day [ECF No. #7 ]. Petitioner's request is therefore DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on November 30, 2020. (bbb, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST to Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield to order Court Clerk to Stamp "Open in Plaintiff's Presence" on court mailings sent to Petitioner - by Petitioner Joseph Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )
October 28, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #6 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY and #7 Clerk's Judgment shall be served by First Class Mail to Joseph Pitts at the address of record on October 29, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 10/28/2020 pursuant to ECF No. #6 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. (emt, )
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY re #1 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/28/2020. (1) The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DISMISSED without prejudice as unexhausted. (2) Any request for a certificate of appealability is DENIED. (3) The Clerk of Court SHALL close the file and terminate this action. (emt, )
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 On 10/5/20, the court issued a Habeas Deficiency Order and instructed Petitioner either to pay the filing fee or submit a completed in forma pauperis application by 11/2/20 [ECF 2]. Before the court is Petitioner's Motion for an Extension of Time to Submit In Forma Pauperis Application [ECF 3]. Because Petitioner has paid the $5.00 filing fee [ECF 4], the motion is DENIED as moot. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 (Letter from Joseph Pitts addressed to Chief Judge J. Michael Seabright, dated October 15, 2020) MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit In Forma Pauperis Application (or in the Alternative, "that his informa pauperis application granted in case CV 20-00431 LEK-KJM be used in his Habeas Petition CV 20-00421 LEK-KJM.") by Petitioner Joseph Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI029496 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (emt, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/5/2020. (emt, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28 USCS 2241, 28 USCS 2243); Memorandum of Law - filed by Joseph Pitts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COVID-19 (Request for Emergency Release addressed to Judge Summerville), #2 After hours time stamp verification) (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. Summerville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Honorable Judge Summerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DPS Former Dir. Nolan Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?